This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/31/2019 at 06:05:38 (UTC).

Mary Pena v. OH Dept of Mental Health, et al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 Mary Pena filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against OH Dept of Mental Health. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3081

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

OHIO DEPARTMENT OF MENTAL HEALTH, Northern Ohio Psychiatric Hospital

WILLIAM STEUK, Huron Municipal Court Judge

FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, Firelands Counseling and Recovery

CITY OF HURON, OHIO

HURON MUNICIPAL POLICE

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARY NOVOTNY PENA

Vermilion, OH 44089

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mary Novotny Pena

P.O. Box 85

Vermilion, OH 44089

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Cover Letter

14 #1

court order filed

#13

(#13) Appellant MOTION filed by Mary Novotny Pena for injunction and/or restraining order. Certificate of service: 02/26/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:37 PM]

#12

(#12) CORRESPONDENCE: cover letter and envelope by Mary Novotny Pena. (PJE) [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:33 PM]

#11

(#11) NOTIFICATION filed by Mary Novotny Pena regarding Contact Information. Certificate of Service: 02/19/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:10 AM]

#10

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Appellant MOTION filed by Mary Novotny Pena to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 02/20/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:05 AM]

#7

(#7) RESPONSE filed to the show cause for jurisdiction - late noa, [ # 5 ]. Response filed by Party Mary Novotny Pena. Certificate of Service:02/20/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:03 AM]

#6

(#6) Appellant MOTION filed by Mary Novotny Pena to extend time to file IFP forms and response to showcause. Certificate of service: 02/20/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:00 AM]

5 #2

Cover Letter

5 #1

show cause order filed

#4

(#4) Copy of copy of NOA and letter directing DC to file appeal from district court filed. (PJE) [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:15 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mary Novotny Pena. Transcript needed: n. (PJE) [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:03 PM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: It is therefore ordered that this appeal is DISMISSED as it applies to the October 31, 2018, judgment. Only issues regarding the January 4, 2019, order may be argued on appeal. Entered by order of the court. (PJE) [Entered: 03/27/2019 07:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Appellant MOTION filed by Mary Novotny Pena for injunction and/or restraining order. Certificate of service: 02/26/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORRESPONDENCE: cover letter and envelope by Mary Novotny Pena. (PJE) [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTIFICATION filed by Mary Novotny Pena regarding Contact Information. Certificate of Service: 02/19/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Financial Affidavit filed by Party Mary Novotny Pena Certificate of Service: 02/20/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • (#9) SEALED DOCUMENT filed by Party Mary Novotny Pena. Document: Social Security Supplemental Security Income form. Certificate of Service: 02/20/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Appellant MOTION filed by Mary Novotny Pena to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 02/20/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE filed to the show cause for jurisdiction - late noa, [ # 5 ]. Response filed by Party Mary Novotny Pena. Certificate of Service:02/20/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Appellant MOTION filed by Mary Novotny Pena to extend time to file IFP forms and response to showcause. Certificate of service: 02/20/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SHOW CAUSE order filed to have Appellant Mary Novotny Pena show cause for possible jurisdictional defect involving the filing of a late notice of appeal. Response due by 02/22/2019 for Mary Novotny Pena. Briefing will be held in abeyance. (PJE) [Entered: 02/01/2019 07:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Copy of copy of NOA and letter directing DC to file appeal from district court filed. (PJE) [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • (#3) Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (PJE) [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Patricia J. Elder (PJE) [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mary Novotny Pena. Transcript needed: n. (PJE) [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ohio Department of Mental Health and Addictive Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Firelands Regional Medical Center is a litigant