This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2021 at 06:18:33 (UTC).

Mary Harris v. The Public Health Trust

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Mary Harris filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The Public Health Trust. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11016

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARY E. HARRIS

Miami, FL 33143

Defendant / Appellee

THE PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, FLORIDA, doing business as Jackson Health System doing business as Jackson Memorial Hospital doing business as Jackson Hospital Ambulatory Clinic

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mary E. Harris

6300 Sw 62Nd Pl

Miami, FL 33143

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

William X. Candela

Attorney at Miami-Dade County Attorney's Office

111 Nw 1St St Ste 2810

Miami, FL 33139

Eric A. Rodriguez

Attorney at Miami-Dade County Attorney's Office

111 Nw 1St St Ste 2810

Miami, FL 33139

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Mary E. Harris. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9389660-1] [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:35 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Mary E. Harris. [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:30 AM]

Open Document #2

Notice of Receipt

Open Document #1

MP-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Eric A. Rodriguez for Appellee Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11016] (ECF: Eric Rodriguez) [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:37 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rodriguez, Eric A. for Appellee Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County [21-11016] (ECF: Eric Rodriguez) [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:11 PM]

Open Document #2

USDC Order or Motion on IFP

Open Document #2

Appearance of counsel form not processed

Open Document #1

ATTY-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11016] (ECF: William Candela) [Entered: 04/28/2021 04:20 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William X. Candela for The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. [21-11016] (ECF: William Candela) [Entered: 04/28/2021 04:15 PM]

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Mary E. Harris. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9389660-1] [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Mary E. Harris. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9389655-1] [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Mary E. Harris. No hearings. [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Mary E. Harris. [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of receipt: CIP as to Appellant Mary E. Harris. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN because it is not filled out correctly. [Entered: 04/30/2021 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Eric A. Rodriguez for Appellee Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11016] (ECF: Eric Rodriguez) [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rodriguez, Eric A. for Appellee Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County [21-11016] (ECF: Eric Rodriguez) [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Mary E. Harris was filed on 03/31/2021. Docket Entry 55. [Entered: 04/29/2021 06:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, William X. Candela for The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 04/28/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11016] (ECF: William Candela) [Entered: 04/28/2021 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William X. Candela for The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. [21-11016] (ECF: William Candela) [Entered: 04/28/2021 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to William X. Candela for The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/27/2021 08:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Mary E. Harris. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/21/2021 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketUSDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Mary E. Harris was filed on 03/29/2021. Docket Entry 52. [Entered: 03/30/2021 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Mary E. Harris on 03/29/2021. Fee Status: IFP Pending. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/12/2021 as to Appellant Mary E. Harris. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/26/2021 as to Appellee The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida [Entered: 03/30/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County The is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William X. Candela