This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/01/2021 at 07:03:40 (UTC).

Mary Carney v. State of Washington, et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 Mary Carney filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against State of Washington. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35744

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARY M. CARNEY

Defendant / Appellees

STATE OF WASHINGTON

WASHINGTON STATE PARKS AND RECREATION COMMISSION

SWINOMISH INDIAN TRIBAL COMMUNITY, a federally recognized Indian tribe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Nicholas Peter Gellert Esquire

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1201 3Rd Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

Jennifer .A. MacLean

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Andy Woo Esquire

Attorney at AGWA - Office of the Washington Attorney General (Olympia)

P.O. Box 40100, 1125 Washington St., Se

Olympia, WA 98504-0100

John Heidinger

Attorney at AGWA - Office of the Washington Attorney General (Olympia)

P.O. Box 40100, 1125 Washington St., Se

Olympia, WA 98504-0100

Andy Woo

P.O. Box 40100, 1125 Washington St., Se

Olympia, WA 98504-0100

Emily Hutchinson Haley

Attorney at Office of the Tribal Attorney

11404 Moorage Way

La Conner, WA 98257-0817

Weston LeMay

Attorney at Swinomish Indian Tribal Community

11404 Moorage Way

La Conner, WA 98257-9450

Wyatt F. Golding

Attorney at Ziontz Chestnut

2101 4Th Avenue

Seattle, WA 98121

Marc D. Slonim

Attorney at Ziontz Chestnut Varnell Berley & Slonim

2101 4Th Avenue

Seattle, WA 98121

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet for Attorneys

1 #5

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mary M. Carney Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/09/2021. [12223855] [21-35744] (MacLean, Jennifer) [Entered: 09/09/2021 08:07 AM]

#8

(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellee Swinomish Indian Tribal Community Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/09/2021. [12224640] [21-35744] (Hutchinson Haley, Emily) [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:30 PM]

#10

(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/30/2021, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12225090] (MS) [Entered: 09/10/2021 09:30 AM]

#14

(#14) Filed order MEDIATION (CG): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant's opening brief is due November 30, 2021; appellees' answering brief is due December 30, 2021; appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [12255362] (SB) [Entered: 10/13/2021 11:07 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed order MEDIATION (CG): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant's opening brief is due November 30, 2021; appellees' answering brief is due December 30, 2021; appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [12255362] (SB) [Entered: 10/13/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#13) Added Attorney(s) John Heidinger for party(s) Appellee Washington State Parks and Recreation Commission Appellee State of Washington, in case 21-35744. [12230661] (JFF) [Entered: 09/16/2021 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John Heidinger (Office of the Attorney General of Washington) for Appellees State of Washington and Washington State Parks and Recreation Commission. Date of service: 09/16/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12230255] [21-35744] (Heidinger, John) [Entered: 09/16/2021 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#11) Added Attorney(s) Weston LeMay for party(s) Appellee Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, in case 21-35744. [12225125] (JFF) [Entered: 09/10/2021 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/30/2021, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12225090] (MS) [Entered: 09/10/2021 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Weston Robert LeMay (Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Office of Tribal Attorney, 11404 Moorage Way, La Conner, WA 98257) for Appellee Swinomish Indian Tribal Community. Date of service: 09/09/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12224888] [21-35744] (LeMay, Weston) [Entered: 09/09/2021 08:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellee Swinomish Indian Tribal Community Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/09/2021. [12224640] [21-35744] (Hutchinson Haley, Emily) [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Emily Hutchinson Haley for party(s) Appellee Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, in case 21-35744. [12224601] (JFF) [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Emily Rae Haley (Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Office of Tribal Attorney, 11404 Moorage Way, La Conner, WA 98257) for Appellee Swinomish Indian Tribal Community. Date of service: 09/09/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12224551] [21-35744] (Hutchinson Haley, Emily) [Entered: 09/09/2021 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance (ECF Filing) [4] is rejected. Filer is not permitted to file on behalf of another attorney. Each attorney must file their own notice of appearance. [12224520] (JFF) [Entered: 09/09/2021 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Emily Rae Haley (Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Office of Tribal Attorney, 11404 Moorage Way, La Conner, WA 98257) for Appellee Swinomish Indian Tribal Community. Date of service: 09/09/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12224479] [21-35744] (LeMay, Weston) [Entered: 09/09/2021 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/09/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12224365]. [21-35744] (AD) [Entered: 09/09/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mary M. Carney Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/09/2021. [12223855] [21-35744] (MacLean, Jennifer) [Entered: 09/09/2021 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Mary M. Carney Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/09/2021. Appellant Mary M. Carney opening brief due 11/01/2021. Appellees State of Washington, Swinomish Indian Tribal Community and Washington State Parks and Recreation Commission answering brief due 11/30/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12218598]--[Edited: attached corrected docketing letter. 09/02/2021 by SLM] (JPD) [Entered: 09/02/2021 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swinomish Indian Tribal Community is a litigant