This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/30/2021 at 06:02:54 (UTC).

Mary Bayes, et al v. Biomet, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Mary Bayes filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Biomet, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2964

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Mary Bayes

Philip Bayes

Defendant / Appellants

Biomet, Inc.

Biomet Orthopedics,LLC

Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC

Biomet Manufacturing LLC, formerly known as Biomet Manufacturing Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

J. Kyle Bachus

Attorney at BACHUS & SCHANKER

Suite 650101 W. Colfax

Denver, CO 80202

John Christopher Elliott

Attorney at BACHUS & SCHANKER

Suite 650101 W. Colfax

Denver, CO 80202

Maurice B. Graham

Attorney at GRAY & RITTER

Suite 800701 Market Street

Saint Louis, MO 63101-0000

James D. O'Leary

Attorney at O'LEARY & SHELTON

University Tower, Penthouse 1-A1034 S. Brentwood Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63117

James G. Onder

Attorney at ONDER LAW, LLC

1St Floor110 E. Lockwood

Saint Louis, MO 63119

Jessica A. Perez

Attorney at PENDLEY & BAUDIN

24110 Eden Street

Plaquemine, LA 70764

Michael J. Quillin

Attorney at O'LEARY & SHELTON

University Tower, Penthouse 1-A1034 S. Brentwood Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63117

Darin L. Schanker

Attorney at BACHUS & SCHANKER

Suite 650101 W. Colfax

Denver, CO 80202

Melanie R. Sulkin

Attorney at BACHUS & SCHANKER

Suite 650101 W. Colfax

Denver, CO 80202

Zachary Wool

Attorney at BARRIOS & KINGSDORF

Suite 3650701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew Albaugh

Attorney at FAEGRE & DRINKER

Suite 2500300 N. Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-5140

Troy Bozarth

Attorney at HEPLER & BROOM

130 N. Main Streetp.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0510

Adrienne Franco Busby

Attorney at FAEGRE & DRINKER

Suite 2500300 N. Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-5140

Victoria Calhoon

Attorney at FAEGRE & DRINKER

Suite 2500300 N. Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-5140

Andrew L. Campbell

Attorney at FAEGRE & DRINKER

Suite 2500300 N. Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-5140

Mary Elizabeth Dyer Kellett

Attorney at HEPLER & BROOM

130 N. Main Streetp.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0510

Erin Linder Hanig

Attorney at LADUE & CURRAN

Suite 300100 E. Wayne Street

South Bend, IN 46601

Mary Hershewe

Attorney at FAEGRE & DRINKER

Suite 34001144 15Th Street

Denver, CO 80202-2569

Thomas James Joensen

Attorney at FAEGRE & DRINKER

33Rd Floor801 Grand Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50309-8011

Stephanie Anne Koltookian

Attorney at FAEGRE & DRINKER

33Rd Floor801 Grand Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50309-8011

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5084744-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Bruce Gregory Jones. Brief of Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. due 11/19/2021. Appendix due on 11/19/2021. [5084949] [21-2964] (ALK) [Entered: 10/07/2021 11:45 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Bruce Gregory Jones for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. correcting [ # 5084744-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Attorney. [5084930] [21-2964] (BGJ) [Entered: 10/07/2021 11:29 AM]

Open Document

Declaration in Support of motion for extension of time to file brief from Appellants Biomet, Inc., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction,LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC and Biomet Manufacturing LLC w/service 10/06/2021. [5084764] [21-2964]--[Edited 10/07/2021 by ALK to specify document type in docket text.] (BGJ) [Entered: 10/06/2021 04:45 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/19/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Bruce Gregory Jones for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. w/service 10/06/2021. [5084744] [21-2964] (BGJ) [Entered: 10/06/2021 04:27 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet, Inc. and Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC - w/service 09/15/2021. [5076809] [21-2964] (ADV) [Entered: 09/15/2021 11:19 AM]

Open Document

LETTER from Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. regarding Advising the Court that Biomet, et al. has decided to prepare and file a separate appendix with their brief.. w/service 09/14/2021 [5076421] [21-2964] (BGJ) [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:29 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc.. No Transcript[5076415] [21-2964] (BGJ) [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:25 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Darin Schanker for Appellees Ms. Mary Bayes and Mr. Philip Bayes w/service 09/10/2021 [5075324] [21-2964] (DLS) [Entered: 09/10/2021 05:02 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by John Christopher Elliott for Appellees Ms. Mary Bayes and Mr. Philip Bayes w/service 09/10/2021 [5075323] [21-2964] (JCE) [Entered: 09/10/2021 05:00 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Troy A. Bozarth for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. w/service 09/09/2021 [5074469] [21-2964] (TB) [Entered: 09/09/2021 11:53 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5074210] [21-2964] (ADV) [Entered: 09/08/2021 03:36 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Aaron Van Oort for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. w/service 09/07/2021 [5073653] [21-2964] (ADV) [Entered: 09/07/2021 03:07 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by John P. Mandler for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. w/service 09/07/2021 [5073645] [21-2964] (JPM) [Entered: 09/07/2021 03:01 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Bruce Jones for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. w/service 09/07/2021 [5073640] [21-2964] (BGJ) [Entered: 09/07/2021 02:57 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Stephanie A. Koltookian for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. w/service 09/07/2021 [5073637] [21-2964] (SAK) [Entered: 09/07/2021 02:53 PM]

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5084744-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Bruce Gregory Jones. Brief of Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. due 11/19/2021. Appendix due on 11/19/2021. [5084949] [21-2964] (ALK) [Entered: 10/07/2021 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Bruce Gregory Jones for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. correcting [ # 5084744-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Attorney. [5084930] [21-2964] (BGJ) [Entered: 10/07/2021 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOn December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions filed under Rule 27, certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion for extension of time to file brief, [ # 5084744-2 ], submitted by Mr. Bruce Gregory Jones in 21-2964 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion. [21-2964] (ALK) [Entered: 10/07/2021 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of motion for extension of time to file brief from Appellants Biomet, Inc., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction,LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC and Biomet Manufacturing LLC w/service 10/06/2021. [5084764] [21-2964]--[Edited 10/07/2021 by ALK to specify document type in docket text.] (BGJ) [Entered: 10/06/2021 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/19/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Bruce Gregory Jones for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. w/service 10/06/2021. [5084744] [21-2964] (BGJ) [Entered: 10/06/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet, Inc. and Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC - w/service 09/15/2021. [5076809] [21-2964] (ADV) [Entered: 09/15/2021 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER from Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. regarding Advising the Court that Biomet, et al. has decided to prepare and file a separate appendix with their brief.. w/service 09/14/2021 [5076421] [21-2964] (BGJ) [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc.. No Transcript[5076415] [21-2964] (BGJ) [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Darin Schanker for Appellees Ms. Mary Bayes and Mr. Philip Bayes w/service 09/10/2021 [5075324] [21-2964] (DLS) [Entered: 09/10/2021 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by John Christopher Elliott for Appellees Ms. Mary Bayes and Mr. Philip Bayes w/service 09/10/2021 [5075323] [21-2964] (JCE) [Entered: 09/10/2021 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Melanie Sulkin for Appellees Ms. Mary Bayes and Mr. Philip Bayes w/service 09/10/2021 [5075318] [21-2964] (MRS) [Entered: 09/10/2021 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Troy A. Bozarth for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. w/service 09/09/2021 [5074469] [21-2964] (TB) [Entered: 09/09/2021 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5074210] [21-2964] (ADV) [Entered: 09/08/2021 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Aaron Van Oort for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. w/service 09/07/2021 [5073653] [21-2964] (ADV) [Entered: 09/07/2021 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by John P. Mandler for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. w/service 09/07/2021 [5073645] [21-2964] (JPM) [Entered: 09/07/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Bruce Jones for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. w/service 09/07/2021 [5073640] [21-2964] (BGJ) [Entered: 09/07/2021 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Stephanie A. Koltookian for Appellants Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. w/service 09/07/2021 [5073637] [21-2964] (SAK) [Entered: 09/07/2021 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 10/12/2021. Appendix due 10/20/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics,LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc. due 10/20/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5071602] [21-2964] (CJO) [Entered: 08/31/2021 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Judgment 11/24/2020, Memorandum and Order 08/02/2021, Memorandum and Order 08/02/2021, Memorandum and Order 08/02/2021,and Memorandum and Order 08/02/2021. [5071595] [21-2964] (CJO) [Entered: 08/31/2021 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5071583] [21-2964] (CJO) [Entered: 08/31/2021 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIOMET U S RECONSTRUCTION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BIOMET INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew T. Albaugh