Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/30/2020 at 07:18:00 (UTC).

Martin Vogel v. La Amapola, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 Martin Vogel filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against La Amapola, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55478

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARTIN VOGEL

Defendant / Appellees

LA AMAPOLA, INC., DBA Tortas Bravas

CMG ENTERPRISES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Scottlynn J. Hubbard Esquire

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LYNN J. HUBBARD, IV

12 Williamsburg Ln.

Chico, CA 95926

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Matthew L. Kinley

Attorney at Kinley Law Practice

111 W. Ocean Boulevard, 4Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11724094] (BLS) [Entered: 06/16/2020 04:14 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 05/29/2020. See order for details. [11691211] (BLS) [Entered: 05/14/2020 02:49 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/14/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11685652] (BLS) [Entered: 05/08/2020 05:08 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Martin Vogel Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/04/2020. [11679650] [20-55478] (Hubbard, Scottlynn) [Entered: 05/04/2020 01:29 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11724094] (BLS) [Entered: 06/16/2020 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 05/29/2020. See order for details. [11691211] (BLS) [Entered: 05/14/2020 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/14/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11685652] (BLS) [Entered: 05/08/2020 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/04/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11680301]. [20-55478] (AD) [Entered: 05/04/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Martin Vogel Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/04/2020. [11679650] [20-55478] (Hubbard, Scottlynn) [Entered: 05/04/2020 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Martin Vogel Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/08/2020. Transcript ordered by 06/01/2020. Transcript due 06/29/2020. Appellant Martin Vogel opening brief due 08/10/2020. Appellees CMG Enterprises, LLC and La Amapola, Inc. answering brief due 09/09/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11677828] (JBS) [Entered: 05/01/2020 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA AMAPOLA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew L Kinley