This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2021 at 06:12:29 (UTC).

Martin v. Salem Police Department, et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Martin filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Salem Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1004

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JOSH H. TURIEL

ELAINE MILO

ARTHUR C. SARENT, III

SALEM POLICE DEPARTMENT

KIMBERLY DRISCOLL

WILLIAM JENNINGS

PETER GIFFORD

EDWARD VAILLANCOURT

THOMAS H. FUREY

JOSEPH A. O'KEEFE, SR.

MARK LOSOLFO

SALEM CITY COUNCIL

SALEM, MA

LISA B. CAMMARATA

MARK BERUBE

DAVID W. EPPLY

LAWRENCE PULEO

ROBERT K. MCCARTHY

FREDERICK DUBIEL

TODD A. SIEGEL

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas R. Donahue

Attorney at Brody Hardoon Perkins & Kesten LLP

699 Boylston St, 12Th Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

Leonard H. Kesten

Attorney at Brody Hardoon Perkins & Kesten LLP

699 Boylston St, 12Th Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

Deidre Brennan Regan

Attorney at Brody Hardoon Perkins & Kesten LLP

699 Boylston St, 12Th Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

Thomas R. Donohue

Attorney at Brody Hardoon Perkins & Kesten LLP

699 Boylston St, 12Th Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

Other Attorneys

Richard B. Martin Jr.

39 Kingston St

Boston, MA 02111-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE of default issued. Appellant failed to file a transcript report/order form by the deadline. If transcripts are necessary for this appeal, appellant is directed to file a transcript order form by 03/22/2021. Absent a timely response, this court will set a briefing schedule, if appropriate. [21-1004] (DPO) [Entered: 03/08/2021 12:49 PM]

Open Document #2

Form 4

Open Document #1

Order

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Mark Berube, Mary Butler, Lisa B. Cammarata, Kimberly Driscoll, Frederick Dubiel, David W. Epply, Heather Famico, Thomas H. Furey, Beth Gerard, Peter Gifford, William Jennings, William H. Legault, Mark Losolfo, Robert K. McCarthy, Elaine Milo, Joseph A. O'Keefe, Sr., Lawrence Puleo, Salem City Council, Salem Police Department, Salem, MA, Arthur C. Sarent, III, Todd A. Siegel, Josh H. Turiel and Edward Vaillancourt filed by Attorney Leonard H. Kesten. Certificate of service dated 01/21/2021. [21-1004] (LHK) [Entered: 01/21/2021 02:58 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Mark Berube, Mary Butler, Lisa B. Cammarata, Kimberly Driscoll, Frederick Dubiel, David W. Epply, Heather Famico, Thomas H. Furey, Beth Gerard, Peter Gifford, William Jennings, William H. Legault, Mark Losolfo, Robert K. McCarthy, Elaine Milo, Joseph A. O'Keefe, Sr., Lawrence Puleo, Salem City Council, Salem Police Department, Salem, MA, Arthur C. Sarent, III, Todd A. Siegel, Josh H. Turiel and Edward Vaillancourt filed by Attorney Deidre Brennan Regan. Certificate of service dated 01/21/2021. [21-1004] (DBR) [Entered: 01/21/2021 02:57 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Mark Berube, Mary Butler, Lisa B. Cammarata, Kimberly Driscoll, Frederick Dubiel, David W. Epply, Heather Famico, Thomas H. Furey, Beth Gerard, Peter Gifford, William Jennings, William H. Legault, Mark Losolfo, Robert K. McCarthy, Elaine Milo, Joseph A. O'Keefe, Sr., Lawrence Puleo, Salem City Council, Salem Police Department, Salem, MA, Arthur C. Sarent, III, Todd A. Siegel, Josh H. Turiel and Edward Vaillancourt filed by Attorney Thomas R. Donohue. Certificate of service dated 01/21/2021. [21-1004] (TRD) [Entered: 01/21/2021 02:51 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default issued. Appellant failed to file a transcript report/order form by the deadline. If transcripts are necessary for this appeal, appellant is directed to file a transcript order form by 03/22/2021. Absent a timely response, this court will set a briefing schedule, if appropriate. [21-1004] (DPO) [Entered: 03/08/2021 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 02/19/2021. [21-1004] (GAK) [Entered: 02/05/2021 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Mark Berube, Mary Butler, Lisa B. Cammarata, Kimberly Driscoll, Frederick Dubiel, David W. Epply, Heather Famico, Thomas H. Furey, Beth Gerard, Peter Gifford, William Jennings, William H. Legault, Mark Losolfo, Robert K. McCarthy, Elaine Milo, Joseph A. O'Keefe, Sr., Lawrence Puleo, Salem City Council, Salem Police Department, Salem, MA, Arthur C. Sarent, III, Todd A. Siegel, Josh H. Turiel and Edward Vaillancourt filed by Attorney Leonard H. Kesten. Certificate of service dated 01/21/2021. [21-1004] (LHK) [Entered: 01/21/2021 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Mark Berube, Mary Butler, Lisa B. Cammarata, Kimberly Driscoll, Frederick Dubiel, David W. Epply, Heather Famico, Thomas H. Furey, Beth Gerard, Peter Gifford, William Jennings, William H. Legault, Mark Losolfo, Robert K. McCarthy, Elaine Milo, Joseph A. O'Keefe, Sr., Lawrence Puleo, Salem City Council, Salem Police Department, Salem, MA, Arthur C. Sarent, III, Todd A. Siegel, Josh H. Turiel and Edward Vaillancourt filed by Attorney Deidre Brennan Regan. Certificate of service dated 01/21/2021. [21-1004] (DBR) [Entered: 01/21/2021 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Mark Berube, Mary Butler, Lisa B. Cammarata, Kimberly Driscoll, Frederick Dubiel, David W. Epply, Heather Famico, Thomas H. Furey, Beth Gerard, Peter Gifford, William Jennings, William H. Legault, Mark Losolfo, Robert K. McCarthy, Elaine Milo, Joseph A. O'Keefe, Sr., Lawrence Puleo, Salem City Council, Salem Police Department, Salem, MA, Arthur C. Sarent, III, Todd A. Siegel, Josh H. Turiel and Edward Vaillancourt filed by Attorney Thomas R. Donohue. Certificate of service dated 01/21/2021. [21-1004] (TRD) [Entered: 01/21/2021 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #69) filed by Appellant Richard B. Martin, Jr.. Transcript Report/Order form and Fee due 01/25/2021. [21-1004] (DPO) [Entered: 01/11/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Salem Police Department is a litigant