This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/22/2021 at 06:01:26 (UTC).

Martin Nothstein v. USA Cycling

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 Martin Nothstein filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against USA Cycling. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3364

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

USA CYCLING

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARTIN W. NOTHSTEIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Alexander Nemiroff Esq.

Sara A. Frey Esq.

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

David P. Heim Esq.

Kiersty DeGroote Esq.

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

15 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

15 #1

Mediation Instructions

14 #2

Transcript Scheduling Order

14 #1

Transcript Scheduling Order Issued

13 #2

Transcript Scheduling Order

13 #1

Transcript Scheduling Order Issued

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part III) filed by O'Connor for the date(s) of 8/4/2020. Transcripts were filed in the District Court on 01/08/2021. [20-3364] (JMG) [Entered: 01/11/2021 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part III) filed by SUZANNE WHITE, OCR. for the date(s) of 6/22/2020. Transcripts were filed in the District Court on 07/02/2020. [20-3364] (JMG) [Entered: 12/17/2020 10:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part III) filed by O'CONNOR for the date(s) of 8/4/2020. Transcripts were filed in the District Court on 01/11/2021. [20-3364] (JMG) [Entered: 12/15/2020 11:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 12/07/2020 01:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER to Court Reporter Michael Hearn directing transcripts, ordered on 12/04/2020 , to be filed by 01/06/2021. (PDB) [Entered: 12/04/2020 08:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER to Court Reporter Mrs. Suzanne R. White directing transcripts, ordered on 12/04/2020, to be filed by 01/06/2021. (TMK) [Entered: 12/04/2020 08:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER FORM (Part 1) ordering transcript of the proceedings. (TMK) [Entered: 12/04/2020 08:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER FORM (Part 1) ordering transcript of the proceedings. (TMK) [Entered: 12/04/2020 08:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee USA Cycling. [20-3364] (SAF) [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sara Anderson Frey on behalf of Appellee(s) USA Cycling. [20-3364] (SAF) [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed on behalf of Appellant Martin W. Nothstein. (TMK) [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONCISE SUMMARY OF THE CASE on behalf of Appellant Martin W. Nothstein, received. (TMK) [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Martin W. Nothstein, received. (TMK) [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Attorney Kiersty DeGroote, Esq. for Appellant Martin W. Nothstein. (TMK) [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Attorney David P. Heim, Esq. for Appellant Martin W. Nothstein. (TMK) [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Kiersty DeGroote, David P. Heim, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 12/08/2020. (AMR) [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Martin W. Nothstein in District Court No. 5-19-cv-01631. (AMR) [Entered: 11/23/2020 01:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less