This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/19/2022 at 06:04:20 (UTC).

Martin Conway v. Smith Development, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Martin Conway filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Smith Development, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1059

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

 

Party Details

Defendant

USBC-ALEXANDRIA (UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT)

Plaintiff / Appellants

MARTIN C. CONWAY

PESNER KAWAMATO CONWAY, P.C.

Defendant / Appellee

SMITH DEVELOPMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Danny Mark Howell

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DANNY M. HOWELL, PLLC

6861 Elm Street

Mclean, VA 22101

Jennifer Lynn Rowlett

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DANNY M. HOWELL, PLLC

6861 Elm Street

Mclean, VA 22101

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

John Simon Lopatto III

1776 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-0000

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Additional Document

16 #1

REPLY (to response)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Smith Development, Inc. that a reply will be filed.. [1001114420] [22-1059] John Lopatto [Entered: 02/22/2022 12:26 PM]

Open Document

Mediation forms. [1001114302] [22-1059] MRB [Entered: 02/22/2022 11:43 AM]

#14

(#14) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001113472] Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/30/2022. Response Brief due 04/29/2022 [22-1059] RHS [Entered: 02/18/2022 02:52 PM]

13 #5

Response in Opp to Mot to Dismiss- Exh D

13 #4

Response in Opp to Mot to Dismiss- Exh C

13 #3

Response in Opp to Mot to Dismiss- Exh B

13 #2

Response in Opp to Mot to Dismiss- Exh A

13 #1

RESPONSE/ANSWER (to motion or request)

#12

(#12) NOTICE ISSUED to Martin C. Conway and Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C. requesting response to motion to dismiss appeal [ # 11 ]Response due 02/18/2022.[1001106720]. [22-1059] RHS [Entered: 02/08/2022 03:16 PM]

#11

(#11) MOTION by Smith Development, Inc. to dismiss appeal [11]. Date and method of service: 02/08/2022 ecf. [1001106674] [22-1059] John Lopatto [Entered: 02/08/2022 02:51 PM]

#10

(#10) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001103507] [22-1059] MRB [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:27 AM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smith Development, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001102371] [22-1059] John Lopatto [Entered: 02/01/2022 02:53 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John S. Lopatto III for Smith Development, Inc.. [1001102370] [22-1059] John Lopatto [Entered: 02/01/2022 02:51 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jennifer Rowlett for Martin C. Conway and Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C.. [1001102272] [22-1059] Jennifer Rowlett [Entered: 02/01/2022 01:39 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Danny M. Howell for Martin C. Conway and Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C.. [1001102256] [22-1059] Danny Howell [Entered: 02/01/2022 01:27 PM]

3 #2

Additional Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY by Smith Development, Inc. to response [ # 13 ].. [1001117665] [22-1059] John Lopatto [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Smith Development, Inc. that a reply will be filed.. [1001114420] [22-1059] John Lopatto [Entered: 02/22/2022 12:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation forms. [1001114302] [22-1059] MRB [Entered: 02/22/2022 11:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001113472] Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/30/2022. Response Brief due 04/29/2022 [22-1059] RHS [Entered: 02/18/2022 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Martin C. Conway and Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C. to notice requesting response [ # 12 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [1001113413] [22-1059] Danny Howell [Entered: 02/18/2022 01:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE ISSUED to Martin C. Conway and Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C. requesting response to motion to dismiss appeal [ # 11 ]Response due 02/18/2022.[1001106720]. [22-1059] RHS [Entered: 02/08/2022 03:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Smith Development, Inc. to dismiss appeal [11]. Date and method of service: 02/08/2022 ecf. [1001106674] [22-1059] John Lopatto [Entered: 02/08/2022 02:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001103507] [22-1059] MRB [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smith Development, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001102371] [22-1059] John Lopatto [Entered: 02/01/2022 02:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John S. Lopatto III for Smith Development, Inc.. [1001102370] [22-1059] John Lopatto [Entered: 02/01/2022 02:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jennifer Rowlett for Martin C. Conway and Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C.. [1001102272] [22-1059] Jennifer Rowlett [Entered: 02/01/2022 01:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Danny M. Howell for Martin C. Conway and Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C.. [1001102256] [22-1059] Danny Howell [Entered: 02/01/2022 01:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/SERVICE LIST by Martin C. Conway and Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C.. Related documents: [ # 4 ] disclosure statement, [ # 3 ] docketing statement [1001102254] [22-1059] Danny Howell [Entered: 02/01/2022 01:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Martin C. Conway and Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001102252] [22-1059] Danny Howell [Entered: 02/01/2022 01:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C. and Martin C. Conway.. [1001102237] [22-1059] Danny Howell [Entered: 02/01/2022 01:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:21-cv-01055-LO-JFA.. [1001093611] [22-1059] RHS [Entered: 01/18/2022 12:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-01055-LO-JFA. Case manager: RSewell. [1001093608] [22-1059] RHS [Entered: 01/18/2022 12:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Smith Development, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Simon Lopatto III