This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2019 at 06:12:08 (UTC).

Marlana Sirls, et al v. MI, et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 Marlana Sirls filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1961

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

STATE OF MICHIGAN, et al

Not Classified By Court

In re: FLINT WATER CASES

Defendant / Appellants

PATRICK COOK

STEPHEN BUSCH

BRADLEY WURFEL

MICHAEL PRYSBY

Plaintiff / Appellees

FELIX SIRLS, Individually and as next friend of their children, A.S.1, A.S. 2, A.S. 3.

MARLANA SIRLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Charles Edward Barbieri

Attorney at Foster, Swift, Collins & Smith

313 S. Washington Square

Lansing, MI 48933

Allison Marie Collins

Attorney at Foster, Swift, Collins & Smith

313 S. Washington Square

Lansing, MI 48933

Krista Aimee Jackson

Attorney at Smith Haughey Rice & Roegge

100 Monroe Center, N.W.

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Philip A. Grashoff Jr.

Attorney at Smith Haughey Rice & Roegge

100 Monroe Center, N.W.

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Michael John Pattwell

Attorney at Clark Hill

212 E. Cesar E. Chavez Avenue

Lansing, MI 48906

Christopher Bradley Clare

Attorney at Clark Hill

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 1300, S.

Washington, DC 27713

Jay M. Berger

Attorney at Clark Hill

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 3500

Detroit, MI 48226

Jordan Seth Bolton

Attorney at Clark Hill

151 S. Old Woodward Avenue, Suite 200

Birmingham, MI 48009

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Hunter J. Shkolnik

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik

400 Broadhollow Road, Suite 305

Melville, NY 11747

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Felix Sirls and Marlana Sirls by Hunter J. Shkolnik. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2019. [19-1961] (HJS) [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:26 PM]

#17

(#17) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher Bradley Clare for Appellant Bradley Wurfel. Certificate of Service:09/13/2019. [19-1961] (CBC) [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:05 PM]

#16

(#16) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Philip A. Grashoff, Jr. for Appellant Stephen Busch. Certificate of Service:09/13/2019. [19-1961] (PAG) [Entered: 09/13/2019 11:45 AM]

#14

(#14) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Charles Edward Barbieri for Appellants Patrick Cook and Michael Prysby. Certificate of Service:09/11/2019. [19-1961] (CEB) [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:06 AM]

13 #2

Additional Document

13 #1

corporate disclosure

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Patrick Cook and Michael Prysby by Allison M. Collins. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1961] (AMC) [Entered: 09/11/2019 10:58 AM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Patrick Cook and Michael Prysby by Charles E. Barbieri. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1961] (CEB) [Entered: 09/11/2019 10:53 AM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Bradley Wurfel by Jay M. Berger. Certificate of Service: 09/10/2019. [19-1961] (JMB) [Entered: 09/10/2019 09:05 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Bradley Wurfel by Jordan S. Bolton. Certificate of Service: 09/09/2019. [19-1961] (JSB) [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:23 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Bradley Wurfel by Christopher B. Clare. Certificate of Service: 09/09/2019. [19-1961] (CBC) [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:04 PM]

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael John Pattwell for Appellant Bradley Wurfel Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1961] (MJP) [Entered: 09/06/2019 08:59 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Bradley Wurfel by Michael J. Pattwell. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1961] (MJP) [Entered: 09/06/2019 08:55 AM]

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Philip A. Grashoff, Jr. for Appellant Stephen Busch Certificate of Service: 08/29/2019. [19-1961] (PAG) [Entered: 08/29/2019 01:35 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Stephen Busch by Philip A. Grashoff, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 08/29/2019. [19-1961] (PAG) [Entered: 08/29/2019 01:34 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Stephen Busch by Krista A. Jackson. Certificate of Service: 08/29/2019. [19-1961] (KAJ) [Entered: 08/29/2019 01:30 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Stephen Busch, Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby and Bradley Wurfel. Hearings held: y. (BLC) [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:07 PM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Felix Sirls and Marlana Sirls by Hunter J. Shkolnik. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2019. [19-1961] (HJS) [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher Bradley Clare for Appellant Bradley Wurfel. Certificate of Service:09/13/2019. [19-1961] (CBC) [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Philip A. Grashoff, Jr. for Appellant Stephen Busch. Certificate of Service:09/13/2019. [19-1961] (PAG) [Entered: 09/13/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • (#15) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Charles Edward Barbieri for Patrick Cook and Michael Prysby. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1961] (CEB) [Entered: 09/11/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Charles Edward Barbieri for Appellants Patrick Cook and Michael Prysby. Certificate of Service:09/11/2019. [19-1961] (CEB) [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Charles Edward Barbieri for Appellants Patrick Cook and Michael Prysby Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1961] (CEB) [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Patrick Cook and Michael Prysby by Allison M. Collins. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1961] (AMC) [Entered: 09/11/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Patrick Cook and Michael Prysby by Charles E. Barbieri. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1961] (CEB) [Entered: 09/11/2019 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Bradley Wurfel by Jay M. Berger. Certificate of Service: 09/10/2019. [19-1961] (JMB) [Entered: 09/10/2019 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Bradley Wurfel by Jordan S. Bolton. Certificate of Service: 09/09/2019. [19-1961] (JSB) [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Bradley Wurfel by Christopher B. Clare. Certificate of Service: 09/09/2019. [19-1961] (CBC) [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael John Pattwell for Appellant Bradley Wurfel Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1961] (MJP) [Entered: 09/06/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Bradley Wurfel by Michael J. Pattwell. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1961] (MJP) [Entered: 09/06/2019 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Philip A. Grashoff, Jr. for Appellant Stephen Busch Certificate of Service: 08/29/2019. [19-1961] (PAG) [Entered: 08/29/2019 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Stephen Busch by Philip A. Grashoff, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 08/29/2019. [19-1961] (PAG) [Entered: 08/29/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Stephen Busch by Krista A. Jackson. Certificate of Service: 08/29/2019. [19-1961] (KAJ) [Entered: 08/29/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Bryant Crutcher: 513-564-7013. (BLC) [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Stephen Busch, Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby and Bradley Wurfel. Hearings held: y. (BLC) [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less