This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2020 at 14:37:12 (UTC).

Markham Concepts, Inc., et al v. Hasbro, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Markham Concepts, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hasbro, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1927

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee

IDA MAE ATKINS

Respondents and Interested Parties

LOUIS MARK SOLOMON

MICHAEL S. LAZAROFF

GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

Plaintiff / Appellants and Petitioner / Appellants

SUSAN GARRETSON

MARKHAM CONCEPTS, INC.

LORRAINE MARKHAM

LORRAINE MARKHAM, individually and in her capacity as trustee of the Bill and Lorraine Markham Exemption Trust and the Lorraine Markham Family Trust

Defendant / Appellees

THOMAS FEIMAN

MICHAEL LINKLETTER

MAX CANDIOTTY

IDA MAE ATKINS

HASBRO, INC.

LAURA LINKLETTER RICH

SHARON LINKLETTER

ROBERT MILLER

DAWN LINKLETTER GRIFFIN

DENNIS LINKLETTER

REUBEN KLAMER

THOMAS FEIMAN, in his capacity as a co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust

MAX CANDIOTTY, in his capacity as co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant and Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Joseph V. Cavanagh Jr.

Attorney at Blish & Cavanaugh LLP

30 Exchange Terr

Providence, RI 02903-0000

John T. Moehringer

Attorney at Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP

200 Liberty St

New York, NY 10281-0000

David Cole

Attorney at Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP

200 Liberty St

New York, NY 10281-0000

Robert James Cavanagh Jr.

Attorney at Blish & Cavanaugh LLP

30 Exchange Terr

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Robert Pollaro

Attorney at Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP

200 Liberty St

New York, NY 10281-0000

Mary C. Dunn

Attorney at Blish & Cavanaugh LLP

30 Exchange Terr

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Gregory A. Markel

Attorney at Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP

200 Liberty St

New York, NY 10281-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christine K. Bush

Attorney at Hinckley Allen LLP

100 Westminster St, Ste 1500

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Ryan M. Gainor

Attorney at Hinckley Allen LLP

100 Westminster St, Ste 1500

Providence, RI 02903-0000

David B. Jinkins

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

1 Us Bank Plaza, Ste 3500

St. Louis, MO 63101-1611

Mitchell N. Reinis

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

2029 Century Park E

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gary Wexler

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

2029 Century Park E

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jacob W.S. Schneider

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

10 Saint James Ave, 11Th Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

Patricia K. Rocha

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

1 Citizens Plaza, 8Th Flr

Providence, RI 02903-1345

Joseph Avanzato

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

1 Citizens Plaza, 8Th Flr

Providence, RI 02903-1345

Joshua C. Krumholz

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

10 Saint James Ave, 11Th Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

Brenna Anatone Force

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

1 Citizens Plaza, 8Th Flr

Providence, RI 02903-1345

Erica J. Van Loon

Attorney at Lathrop Gage LLP

1888 Century Park E, Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1623

Thomas P. Burke Jr.

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Patricia L. Glaser

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90067

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/23/2020. [19-1927] (LIM) [Entered: 01/24/2020 10:05 AM]

Open Document #2

Appellee's Briefing Notice

Open Document #1

Appellants' Brief

Open Document

BRIEF tendered by Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 01/23/2020 09:01 PM]

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Markham Concepts, Inc., Lorraine Markham and Susan Garretson. Brief and Appendix due 01/23/2020 for appellant Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 11/19/2019 04:16 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. Certificate of service dated 11/15/2019. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 11/15/2019 05:35 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Robert C. Foote, III for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Gregory A. Markel for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Thomas P. Burke, Jr. for Reuben Klamer, Mitchell N. Reinis for Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Laura Linkletter Rich and Dennis Linkletter, Jacob W.S. Schneider for Hasbro, Inc. and Gary Wexler for Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter and Laura Linkletter Rich. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 11/04/2019 12:10 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Courtney L. Batliner. Certificate of service dated 11/01/2019. [19-1927] (CLB) [Entered: 11/01/2019 01:20 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 10/16/2019 06:01 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 10/16/2019 05:57 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Markham Concepts, Inc., Lorraine Markham and Susan Garretson filed by Attorney Robert M. Pollaro. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 10/16/2019 05:56 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Patricia K. Rocha. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (PKR) [Entered: 10/16/2019 05:06 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Joshua C. Krumholz. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (JCK) [Entered: 10/16/2019 04:20 PM]

Open Document

SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 271. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 10/31/2019 09:15 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated record

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • APPENDIX filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. Number of volumes: 5. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 01/23/2020. [19-1927] (LIM) [Entered: 01/24/2020 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/23/2020. [19-1927] (LIM) [Entered: 01/24/2020 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANTS' BRIEF filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/23/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/31/2020 . Brief due 02/24/2020 for APPELLEES Max Candiotty, Thomas Feiman, Hasbro, Inc., Reuben Klamer, Dennis Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Sharon Linkletter, Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Laura Linkletter Rich and Robert Miller. [19-1927] (LIM) [Entered: 01/24/2020 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF tendered by Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 01/23/2020 09:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Markham Concepts, Inc., Lorraine Markham and Susan Garretson. Brief and Appendix due 01/23/2020 for appellant Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 11/19/2019 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. Certificate of service dated 11/15/2019. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 11/15/2019 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 272-288. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 11/22/2019 06:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Robert C. Foote, III for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Gregory A. Markel for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Thomas P. Burke, Jr. for Reuben Klamer, Mitchell N. Reinis for Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Laura Linkletter Rich and Dennis Linkletter, Jacob W.S. Schneider for Hasbro, Inc. and Gary Wexler for Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter and Laura Linkletter Rich. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 11/04/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Courtney L. Batliner. Certificate of service dated 11/01/2019. [19-1927] (CLB) [Entered: 11/01/2019 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 12/09/2019 for appellant Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 10/30/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Reuben Klamer filed by Attorney Erica J. Van Loon. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (EJV) [Entered: 10/16/2019 10:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Max Candiotty, Thomas Feiman, Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Laura Linkletter Rich, Dennis Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Sharon Linkletter and Robert Miller filed by Attorney David B. Jinkins. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (DBJ) [Entered: 10/16/2019 08:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham filed by Attorney David A. Cole. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (DC) [Entered: 10/16/2019 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 10/16/2019 06:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 10/16/2019 05:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Markham Concepts, Inc., Lorraine Markham and Susan Garretson filed by Attorney Robert M. Pollaro. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 10/16/2019 05:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Patricia K. Rocha. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (PKR) [Entered: 10/16/2019 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Joshua C. Krumholz. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (JCK) [Entered: 10/16/2019 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 271. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 10/31/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #267) filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. Docketing Statement due 10/17/2019. Transcript Report/Order form due 10/17/2019. Appearance form due 10/17/2019. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 10/03/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.