This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/29/2022 at 06:01:39 (UTC).

Markham Concepts, Inc., et al v. Hasbro, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 Markham Concepts, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hasbro, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1957

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendants

REUBEN KLAMER

DAWN LINKLETTER GRIFFIN

SHARON LINKLETTER

MICHAEL LINKLETTER

LAURA LINKLETTER RICH

DENNIS LINKLETTER

THOMAS FEIMAN, in his capacity as a co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust

ROBERT MILLER, in his capacity as a co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust

MAX CANDIOTTY, in his capacity as co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust

IDA MAE ATKINS

Plaintiff / Appellees

MARKHAM CONCEPTS, INC.

LORRAINE MARKHAM, individually and in her capacity as trustee of the Bill and Lorraine Markham Exemption Trust and the Lorraine Markham Family Trust

SUSAN GARRETSON

Defendant / Appellant

HASBRO, INC.

Interested Parties

GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

LOUIS MARK SOLOMON

MICHAEL S. LAZAROFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Armando E. Batastini

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

1 Citizens Plaza, 5Th Flr

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Thomas P. Burke Jr.

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd, 19Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Patricia L. Glaser

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd, 19Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Eric E. Renner

Attorney at Renner Law LLC

50 S Main St, Ste 202

Providence, RI 02903

Erica J. Van Loon

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

300 S Grand Ave, Ste 4100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Joseph V. Cavanagh Jr.

Attorney at Blish & Cavanaugh LLP

30 Exchange Terr

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Robert James Cavanagh Jr.

Attorney at Blish & Cavanaugh LLP

30 Exchange Terr

Providence, RI 02903-0000

David Cole

Attorney at Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP

200 Liberty St

New York, NY 10281-0000

Mary C. Dunn

Attorney at Blish & Cavanaugh LLP

30 Exchange Terr

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Robert C. Foote III

Attorney at Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP

200 Liberty St

New York, NY 10281-0000

Gregory A. Markel

Attorney at Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP

200 Liberty St

New York, NY 10281-0000

John T. Moehringer

Attorney at Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP

200 Liberty St

New York, NY 10281-0000

Robert Pollaro

Attorney at Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP

200 Liberty St

New York, NY 10281-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Joseph Avanzato

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

1 Citizens Plaza, 8Th Flr

Providence, RI 02903-1345

Courtney L. Batliner

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

10 Saint James Ave, 11Th Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

Brenna Anatone Force

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

1 Citizens Plaza, 8Th Flr

Providence, RI 02903-1345

Mark T. Goracke

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

10 Saint James Ave, 11Th Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

Joshua C. Krumholz

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

10 Saint James Ave, 11Th Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

Patricia K. Rocha

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

1 Citizens Plaza, 8Th Flr

Providence, RI 02903-1345

Jacob W.S. Schneider

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

10 Saint James Ave, 11Th Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Gregory A. Markel for Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. Copy of appellant's briefing notice issued December 23, 2021. [21-1957, 21-1958] (ATC) [Entered: 01/21/2022 10:54 AM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Gregory A. Markel for Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. Copy of notice issued December 30, 2021. [21-1957, 21-1958] (ATC) [Entered: 01/13/2022 04:25 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Robert C. Foote, III for Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. Copy of notice issued December 30, 2021. [21-1957, 21-1958] (ATC) [Entered: 01/13/2022 12:35 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Gregory A. Markel for Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham in 21-1957, 21-1958. Copy of notice issued December 30, 2021. [21-1957, 21-1958] (ATC) [Entered: 01/12/2022 12:48 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Gregory A. Markel for Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham in 21-1957, 21-1958. Copy of order issued December 22, 2021. [21-1957, 21-1958] (ATC) [Entered: 01/12/2022 12:47 PM]

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Hasbro, Inc., and Reuben Klamer. Brief and Appendix due 03/18/2022 for appellant's Hasbro, Inc. and Reuben Klamer. [21-1957, 21-1958] (DO) [Entered: 01/07/2022 10:21 AM]

Open Document

JOINT MOTION to consolidate cases with 19-1927, to extend time to file brief , and to adopt the Joint Appendix filed in 19-1927 filed by Appellant Hasbro, Inc. in 21-1957 and Appellant Reuben Klamer in 21-1958. Served on 01/05/2022. [21-1957, 21-1958] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief and party selection were incomplete. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (EJV) [Entered: 01/05/2022 07:29 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Ilene L. Pabian. Served on 01/03/2022. [21-1957] (ILP) [Entered: 01/03/2022 04:19 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Jacob W.S. Schneider for Hasbro, Inc., Robert C. Foote, III for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Gregory A. Markel for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Mitchell N. Reinis for Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Laura Linkletter Rich and Dennis Linkletter and Gary Wexler for Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter and Laura Linkletter Rich. [21-1957] (JAW) [Entered: 12/30/2021 12:21 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Mark T. Goracke. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1957] (MTG) [Entered: 12/13/2021 08:54 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Hasbro, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1957] (JCK) [Entered: 12/13/2021 08:46 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Joshua C. Krumholz. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1957] (JCK) [Entered: 12/13/2021 08:43 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Reuben Klamer in 21-1958, Not Party Reuben Klamer in 21-1957 filed by Attorney Patricia L. Glaser. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1958, 21-1957] (PLG) [Entered: 12/13/2021 08:34 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc., Lorraine Markham and Susan Garretson filed by Attorney David A. Cole. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1957] (DC) [Entered: 12/13/2021 04:33 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc., Lorraine Markham and Susan Garretson filed by Attorney John T. Moehringer. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1957] (JTM) [Entered: 12/13/2021 04:22 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated District Court Record

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Gregory A. Markel for Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. Copy of appellant's briefing notice issued December 23, 2021. [21-1957, 21-1958] (ATC) [Entered: 01/21/2022 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Gregory A. Markel for Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. Copy of notice issued December 30, 2021. [21-1957, 21-1958] (ATC) [Entered: 01/13/2022 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Robert C. Foote, III for Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. Copy of notice issued December 30, 2021. [21-1957, 21-1958] (ATC) [Entered: 01/13/2022 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Gregory A. Markel for Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham in 21-1957, 21-1958. Copy of notice issued December 30, 2021. [21-1957, 21-1958] (ATC) [Entered: 01/12/2022 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Gregory A. Markel for Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham in 21-1957, 21-1958. Copy of order issued December 22, 2021. [21-1957, 21-1958] (ATC) [Entered: 01/12/2022 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Hasbro, Inc., and Reuben Klamer. Brief and Appendix due 03/18/2022 for appellant's Hasbro, Inc. and Reuben Klamer. [21-1957, 21-1958] (DO) [Entered: 01/07/2022 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT MOTION to consolidate cases with 19-1927, to extend time to file brief , and to adopt the Joint Appendix filed in 19-1927 filed by Appellant Hasbro, Inc. in 21-1957 and Appellant Reuben Klamer in 21-1958. Served on 01/05/2022. [21-1957, 21-1958] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief and party selection were incomplete. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (EJV) [Entered: 01/05/2022 07:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Ilene L. Pabian. Served on 01/03/2022. [21-1957] (ILP) [Entered: 01/03/2022 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Jacob W.S. Schneider for Hasbro, Inc., Robert C. Foote, III for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Gregory A. Markel for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Mitchell N. Reinis for Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Laura Linkletter Rich and Dennis Linkletter and Gary Wexler for Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter and Laura Linkletter Rich. [21-1957] (JAW) [Entered: 12/30/2021 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 02/01/2022 for appellant Hasbro, Inc. and Reuben Klamer. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1957, 21-1958] (JAW) [Entered: 12/23/2021 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 12/29/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Jacob W.S. Schneider for Hasbro, Inc., Robert C. Foote, III for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Gregory A. Markel for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Mitchell N. Reinis for Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Laura Linkletter Rich and Dennis Linkletter and Gary Wexler for Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter and Laura Linkletter Rich. [21-1957] (JAW) [Entered: 12/15/2021 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Patricia K. Rocha. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2021. [21-1957] (PKR) [Entered: 12/14/2021 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Courtney L. Batliner. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1957] (CLB) [Entered: 12/13/2021 09:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Mark T. Goracke. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1957] (MTG) [Entered: 12/13/2021 08:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Hasbro, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1957] (JCK) [Entered: 12/13/2021 08:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Joshua C. Krumholz. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1957] (JCK) [Entered: 12/13/2021 08:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Reuben Klamer in 21-1958, Not Party Reuben Klamer in 21-1957 filed by Attorney Patricia L. Glaser. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1958, 21-1957] (PLG) [Entered: 12/13/2021 08:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc., Lorraine Markham and Susan Garretson filed by Attorney David A. Cole. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1957] (DC) [Entered: 12/13/2021 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Markham Concepts, Inc., Lorraine Markham and Susan Garretson filed by Attorney John T. Moehringer. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2021. [21-1957] (JTM) [Entered: 12/13/2021 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #296) filed by Appellant Hasbro, Inc.. Docketing Statement due 12/14/2021. Transcript Report/Order form due 12/14/2021. Appearance form due 12/14/2021. [21-1957] (CMP) [Entered: 11/30/2021 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hasbro, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric E. Renner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Armando E. Batastini