This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2019 at 06:11:37 (UTC).

Markel v. Douglas Technologies Group

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Markel filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Douglas Technologies Group. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1845

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

DOUGLAS TECHNOLOGIES GROUP, INC., a California corporation, dba Douglas Wheel Technologies

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANTHONY MARKEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kyle Alan Eidsness

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

333 South Seventh St, Suite 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Joshua Vincent

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N Franklin Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Brian D. Stofferahn

Attorney at Tewksbury & Kerfeld

88 South Tenth Street, Suite 300

Minneapolis, MN 55403

Nathan C. Brunette

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

760 Sw Ninth Avenue, Suite 3000

Portland, OR 97205

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) RESPONSE of Appellant Anthony Markel to the court order to show cause [ # 13 ] , court order to stay appeal [ # 13 ] , court order [ # 13 ]. Service: 06/13/2019 by email, US mail. [614081] [19-1845] [Nathan Brunette] [Entered: 06/13/2019 07:47 PM]

#13

(#13) ORDER filed. Within 21 days of the date of filing of this order, the parties are directed to respond as to whether this appeal should be transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. The briefing schedule is stayed. Service: 06/05/2019 by clerk. [611809] [NEL] [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:45 PM]

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Anthony Markel. Service: 05/24/2019 by email. [609689] [19-1845] [Nathan Brunette] [Entered: 05/24/2019 05:08 PM]

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Anthony Markel, Corrected Certificate of Interest [ # 10 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 06/03/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[609667] [JAL] [Entered: 05/24/2019 04:14 PM]

#10

(#10) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Anthony Markel. Service: 05/24/2019 by email. [609590] [19-1845] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 11 ] [Nathan Brunette] [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:56 PM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Anthony Markel, Certificate of Interest [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 05/31/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[609280] [JAL] [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:26 AM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Douglas Technologies Group, Inc.. Service: 05/22/2019 by email, US mail. [609197] [19-1845] [Joshua Vincent] [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:23 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Douglas Technologies Group, Inc.. Service: 05/22/2019 by email, US mail. [609190] [19-1845] [Joshua Vincent] [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:19 PM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Joshua G. Vincent as principal counsel for Appellee Douglas Technologies Group, Inc.. Service: 05/22/2019 by email, US mail. [609180] [19-1845] [Joshua Vincent] [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:09 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Anthony Markel. Service: 05/21/2019 by email. [608859] [19-1845] [Nathan Brunette] [Entered: 05/21/2019 06:06 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Anthony Markel. Service: 05/21/2019 by email. [608857] [19-1845] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 9 ] [Nathan Brunette] [Entered: 05/21/2019 06:04 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Nathan C. Brunette as principal counsel for Appellant Anthony Markel. Service: 05/21/2019 by email. [608855] [19-1845] [Nathan Brunette] [Entered: 05/21/2019 06:01 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • (#15) REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [615205] [JAL] [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE of Appellant Anthony Markel to the court order to show cause [ # 13 ] , court order to stay appeal [ # 13 ] , court order [ # 13 ]. Service: 06/13/2019 by email, US mail. [614081] [19-1845] [Nathan Brunette] [Entered: 06/13/2019 07:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER filed. Within 21 days of the date of filing of this order, the parties are directed to respond as to whether this appeal should be transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. The briefing schedule is stayed. Service: 06/05/2019 by clerk. [611809] [NEL] [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Anthony Markel. Service: 05/24/2019 by email. [609689] [19-1845] [Nathan Brunette] [Entered: 05/24/2019 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Anthony Markel, Corrected Certificate of Interest [ # 10 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 06/03/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[609667] [JAL] [Entered: 05/24/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Anthony Markel. Service: 05/24/2019 by email. [609590] [19-1845] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 11 ] [Nathan Brunette] [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Anthony Markel, Certificate of Interest [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 05/31/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[609280] [JAL] [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 2 ], ERROR: The contact information on the entry of appearance for N. Brunette [ # 2 ] does not match the information in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure that the contact information on the entry of appearance and in the user account matches. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [609273] [JAL] [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Douglas Technologies Group, Inc.. Service: 05/22/2019 by email, US mail. [609197] [19-1845] [Joshua Vincent] [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Douglas Technologies Group, Inc.. Service: 05/22/2019 by email, US mail. [609190] [19-1845] [Joshua Vincent] [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Joshua G. Vincent as principal counsel for Appellee Douglas Technologies Group, Inc.. Service: 05/22/2019 by email, US mail. [609180] [19-1845] [Joshua Vincent] [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Anthony Markel. Service: 05/21/2019 by email. [608859] [19-1845] [Nathan Brunette] [Entered: 05/21/2019 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Anthony Markel. Service: 05/21/2019 by email. [608857] [19-1845] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 9 ] [Nathan Brunette] [Entered: 05/21/2019 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Nathan C. Brunette as principal counsel for Appellant Anthony Markel. Service: 05/21/2019 by email. [608855] [19-1845] [Nathan Brunette] [Entered: 05/21/2019 06:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/03/2019. [605522] Entry of Appearance is due 05/21/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/21/2019. Docketing Statement is due 05/21/2019. Appellant's brief is due 07/08/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 05/07/2019 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.