This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 07:12:52 (UTC).

Mark Nance v. Warden, et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Mark Nance filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10052

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ROBIN OWENS, D/W Care and Treatment

CYTHIA RIVERS, Chief Counselor

ASHRAF NOORI, Counselor

WARDEN

LAQUIDA LEWIS BROWN, O Building Counselor

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARK ELLERY NANCE

Garden City, GA 31408

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Coastal SP Warden

Attorney at Coastal SP - Inmate Trust Fund

Po Box 7150

Garden City, GA 31408

Mark Ellery Nance

Attorney at Coastal SP - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 7150

Garden City, GA 31408

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

LetterHead Only

Open Document #2

Public Communication

Open Document #5

USDC Judgment- Doc #11

Open Document #2

Motion or Document Returned Unfiled

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Mark Ellery Nance. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:30 AM]

Open Document #2

PLRA Prisoner Case Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #4

USDC Order- Doc #10

Open Document #3

R&R- Doc #9

Open Document #1

MOT-11 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the Appellant Mark Ellery Nance failed to pay the filing and docketing fees (or file a motion in the district court for relief from the obligation to pay in advance the full fee) to the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:13 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Public Communication: Appellant inquiry and deputy clerk's reply. Motion for leave form available from USDC; USCA rules available online [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED UNFILED: Motion to Continue Action filed by Mark Ellery Nance is returned unfiled because this Court will not consider any further motion until/unless the deficiency has been cured. [Entered: 02/04/2019 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the Appellant Mark Ellery Nance failed to pay the filing and docketing fees (or file a motion in the district court for relief from the obligation to pay in advance the full fee) to the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Mark Ellery Nance. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Mark Ellery Nance on 01/04/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 01/07/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less