This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:00:09 (UTC).

Mark Migdal v. BOP

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Mark Migdal filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BOP. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55809

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARK MIGDAL

Defendant / Appellee

FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Brandon Sample

Attorney at Brandon Sample PLC

P.O. Box 250

Rutland, VT 05702

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer Raines Jacobs

Attorney at USLA - Office of the U.S. Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Jasmin Yang

Attorney at USLA - Office of the U.S. Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellee BOP response to motion ([ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 08/21/2019. [11405966] [19-55809] (Yang, Jasmin) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:07 PM]

#12

(#12) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Mark Migdal. Date of service: 08/30/2019. [11417623] [19-55809] (Sample, Brandon) [Entered: 08/30/2019 06:26 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 09/16/2019. See order for details. [11398876] (MS) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:14 PM]

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/09/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11384625] (BLS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 03:28 PM]

#11

(#11) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Mark Migdal. Date of service: 08/30/2019. [11417622] [19-55809] (Sample, Brandon) [Entered: 08/30/2019 06:25 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mark Migdal Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/23/2019. [11374416] [19-55809]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to correct party filer. 07/24/2019 by QDL] (Sample, Brandon) [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:30 PM]

#14

(#14) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 11 ] and excerpts of record [ # 12 ] submitted by Mark Migdal are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11419634] (LA) [Entered: 09/03/2019 06:20 PM]

#10

(#10) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA and MARK J. BENNETT): The motion to expedite (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) is granted in part and denied in part. The opening brief is due August 30, 2019. The answering brief is due September 30, 2019. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a)(1). The Clerk shall place this case on the next available calendar. [11411895] (AF) [Entered: 08/27/2019 11:46 AM]

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mark Migdal Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 08/13/2019. [11396535] [19-55809] (Sample, Brandon) [Entered: 08/13/2019 06:55 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 11 ] and excerpts of record [ # 12 ] submitted by Mark Migdal are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11419634] (LA) [Entered: 09/03/2019 06:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • (#13) Deleted Incorrect Entry. [11419633] (LA) [Entered: 09/03/2019 06:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Mark Migdal. Date of service: 08/30/2019. [11417623] [19-55809] (Sample, Brandon) [Entered: 08/30/2019 06:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Mark Migdal. Date of service: 08/30/2019. [11417622] [19-55809] (Sample, Brandon) [Entered: 08/30/2019 06:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA and MARK J. BENNETT): The motion to expedite (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) is granted in part and denied in part. The opening brief is due August 30, 2019. The answering brief is due September 30, 2019. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a)(1). The Clerk shall place this case on the next available calendar. [11411895] (AF) [Entered: 08/27/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed (ECF) Appellee BOP response to motion ([ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 08/21/2019. [11405966] [19-55809] (Yang, Jasmin) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • (#8) Attorney Jennifer Raines Jacobs substituted by Attorney Jasmin Yang in 19-55809. [11405891] (HH) [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jasmin Yang (US Attorney's Office 300 N. Los Angeles Street, Rm. 7516, Los Angeles, CA 90012) for Appellee BOP. Substitution for Attorney Ms. Jennifer Raines Jacobs for Appellee BOP. Date of service: 08/21/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11405854] [19-55809] (Yang, Jasmin) [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 09/16/2019. See order for details. [11398876] (MS) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mark Migdal Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 08/13/2019. [11396535] [19-55809] (Sample, Brandon) [Entered: 08/13/2019 06:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/09/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11384625] (BLS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/23/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11374455][19-55809] (AD) [Entered: 07/24/2019 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mark Migdal Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/23/2019. [11374416] [19-55809]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to correct party filer. 07/24/2019 by QDL] (Sample, Brandon) [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/23/2019. Appellant Mark Migdal opening brief due 09/13/2019. Appellee Federal Bureau of Prisons answering brief due 10/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11364763] (RT) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.