This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/19/2021 at 06:12:14 (UTC).

Mark Cuhaci v. Kouri Group, LP

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Mark Cuhaci filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kouri Group, LP. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-12856

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

MARK CUHACI

Defendant / Appellant

KOURI GROUP, LP, a Florida limited partnership,

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey A. Cohen

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

700 Nw 1St Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33136

Naomi Massave Berry

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

700 Nw 1St Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33136

Brianna Elizabeth Donet

Attorney at Carlton Fields PA

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 4200

Miami, FL 33131

Merrick Gross

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

700 Nw 1St Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33136

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Stephen James Binhak

Attorney at Law Office of Stephen James Binhak, PLLC

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33131

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Robert T. Dunlap

Attorney at Black Srebnick Kornspan & Stumpf, PA

201 Biscayne Blvd Ste 1300

Miami, FL 33131

Hector James Montalvo

Attorney at Law Offices of H. James Montalvo, PA

7301 Sw 57Th Ct Ste 510

S Miami, FL 33143

Howard M. Srebnick

Attorney at Black Srebnick Kornspan & Stumpf, PA

201 Biscayne Blvd Ste 1300

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

Order DE 120

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellee Mark Cuhaci [ # 9487976-2 ] filed by Attorney Stephen James Binhak for Appellant Kouri Group, LP. [21-12856] (ECF: Stephen Binhak) [Entered: 09/30/2021 08:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to Relinquish Jurisdiction filed by Kouri Group, LP. Motion is Unopposed. [9492857-1] [21-12856] (ECF: Stephen Binhak) [Entered: 09/26/2021 02:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketOver the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Stephen James Binhak for Appellant Kouri Group, LP. Appellant's brief is due on 10/26/2021. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 09/24/2021 09:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC Order of Indicative Ruling Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1 was filed on 09/22/2021. Docket Entry 155. [Entered: 09/22/2021 11:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by Mark Cuhaci. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9487976-1] [21-12856] (ECF: Merrick Gross) [Entered: 09/20/2021 02:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jeffrey A. Cohen for Appellee Mark Cuhaci. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12856] (ECF: Jeffrey Cohen) [Entered: 09/20/2021 11:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jeffrey A. Cohen and Merrick Gross for Mark Cuhaci. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 09/20/2021 10:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Merrick L. Gross for Mark Cuhaci Merrick Gross for Mark Cuhaci. [21-12856] (ECF: Merrick Gross) [Entered: 09/02/2021 03:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey A. Cohen, Counsel for Mark Cuhaci [21-12856] (ECF: Jeffrey Cohen) [Entered: 09/02/2021 02:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 08/31/2021 11:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Stephen James Binhak for Appellant Kouri Group, LP. [21-12856] (ECF: Stephen Binhak) [Entered: 08/23/2021 03:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stephen James Binhak for Appellant Kouri Group, LP. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12856] (ECF: Stephen Binhak) [Entered: 08/23/2021 02:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Stephen James Binhak for Appellant Kouri Group, LP. No hearings. [21-12856] (ECF: Stephen Binhak) [Entered: 08/23/2021 02:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen James Binhak for Kouri Group, LP. [21-12856] (ECF: Stephen Binhak) [Entered: 08/23/2021 02:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Kouri Group, LP on 08/18/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. USDC motion pending: MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Jean Marie Echemendia DE 135. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/27/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/03/2021 as to Appellant Kouri Group, LP. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/17/2021 as to Appellee Mark Cuhaci [Entered: 08/23/2021 12:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hector James Montalvo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard Milton Srebnick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert T. Dunlap