Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2021 at 06:28:28 (UTC).

Mark Crawford, et al v. Jeffrey Rosen

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Mark Crawford filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Jeffrey Rosen. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5355

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General

Jeffrey Rosen, Acting U.S. Attorney General

Plaintiff / Appellants

Melissa Matthews

Nelson Rhone

Durand L. Odom

Mark Crawford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

John C. Truong

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Elizabeth Pascal

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Lawrence Berger Esquire

Attorney at Mahon & Berger

70 Glen Street, Suite 280

Glen Cove, NY 11542-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1879679] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1878978-2 ]; any dispositive motions are now due 02/17/2021 [20-5355] [Entered: 01/12/2021 03:04 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION [1878978] to extend time to file motion to 02/17/2021 filed by Jeffrey Rosen [Service Date: 01/08/2021 ] Length Certification: 439 Words. [20-5355] (Truong, John) [Entered: 01/08/2021 09:19 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1878202] filed by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone [Service Date: 01/04/2021 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 01/04/2021 10:38 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1878029] filed by Elizabeth A. Pascal, Assistant U.S. Attorney on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Rosen. [20-5355] (Pascal, Elizabeth) [Entered: 12/31/2020 11:18 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1877982] filed by John C. Truong on behalf of Appellee William P. Barr. [20-5355] (Truong, John) [Entered: 12/31/2020 08:57 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1877978] filed by William P. Barr [Service Date: 12/31/2020 ] [20-5355] (Truong, John) [Entered: 12/31/2020 08:46 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1877607] filed by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone [Service Date: 12/29/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:19 PM]

Open Document

UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1877606] submitted by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:18 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1877604] filed by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone [Service Date: 12/29/2020 ] [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:16 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1877603] filed by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone [Service Date: 12/29/2020 ] [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:15 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1877601] filed by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone [Service Date: 12/29/2020 ] [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:14 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1877598] filed by Lawrence Berger on behalf of Appellants Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone. [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:12 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1873773] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/15/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/31/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/31/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/31/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/15/2021 [20-5355] [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:20 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1873770] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-00798-JEB filed by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5355. [20-5355] [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:19 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1879679] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1878978-2 ]; any dispositive motions are now due 02/17/2021 [20-5355] [Entered: 01/12/2021 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION [1878978] to extend time to file motion to 02/17/2021 filed by Jeffrey Rosen [Service Date: 01/08/2021 ] Length Certification: 439 Words. [20-5355] (Truong, John) [Entered: 01/08/2021 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1878202] filed by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone [Service Date: 01/04/2021 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 01/04/2021 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1878029] filed by Elizabeth A. Pascal, Assistant U.S. Attorney on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Rosen. [20-5355] (Pascal, Elizabeth) [Entered: 12/31/2020 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1877982] filed by John C. Truong on behalf of Appellee William P. Barr. [20-5355] (Truong, John) [Entered: 12/31/2020 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1877978] filed by William P. Barr [Service Date: 12/31/2020 ] [20-5355] (Truong, John) [Entered: 12/31/2020 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1877607] filed by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone [Service Date: 12/29/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1877606] submitted by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1877604] filed by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone [Service Date: 12/29/2020 ] [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1877603] filed by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone [Service Date: 12/29/2020 ] [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1877601] filed by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone [Service Date: 12/29/2020 ] [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1877598] filed by Lawrence Berger on behalf of Appellants Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone. [20-5355] (Berger, Lawrence) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1873773] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/31/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/15/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/31/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/31/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/31/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/15/2021 [20-5355] [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1873770] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-00798-JEB filed by Mark Crawford, Melissa Matthews, Durand L. Odom and Nelson Rhone. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5355. [20-5355] [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5355] [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence Berger Esq.