This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/28/2021 at 06:12:12 (UTC).

Mark Anthony Davis v. Carol Braidi, et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 Mark Anthony Davis filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Carol Braidi,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55687

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Defendants

DOES, 1-9, inclusive

BOULEVARD NIGHTLIFE GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company, AKA Hemmingways, DBA The Study

ELIE BRAIDI, an individual, AKA Elie Braidy

LEONARDO GOVANICHI, an individual

JAMIE KOZ, an individual, AKA White Lightning

FREDDY BRAIDI, an individual, AKA Freddy Braidy

LIOR GOV

SPENCER KUSHNER, an individual

Plaintiff / Appellee

MARK ANTHONY DAVIS, an individual, AKA Quie Anthony, AKA QBwoy

Defendant / Appellant

CAROL BRAIDI, an individual, AKA Carol Braidy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Taylor James Howard Esquire

Attorney at AEI Law PC

7755 Center Avenue Suite 1100

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Warren Hodges Jr.

Attorney at Ritt Tai Thvedt and Hodges, LLP

65 N Raymond Avenue, Suite 320

Pasadena, CA 91103

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/06/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12164458]. [21-55687] (AD) [Entered: 07/07/2021 06:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Carol Braidi Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/06/2021. [12164364] [21-55687] (Hodges, Warren) [Entered: 07/06/2021 06:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Carol Braidi Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/06/2021. Transcript ordered by 07/28/2021. Transcript due 08/27/2021. Appellant Carol Braidi opening brief due 10/04/2021. Appellee Mark Anthony Davis answering brief due 11/04/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12158251] (RT) [Entered: 06/29/2021 03:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOULEVARD NIGHTLIFE GROUP LLC DBA PROJECT CLUB LA is a litigant