This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/21/2020 at 06:12:58 (UTC).

Mark Anthony Davis v. Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Mark Anthony Davis filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55975

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Defendants

DOES, 1-9, inclusive

CAROL BRAIDI, an individual, AKA Carol Braidy

LEONARDO GOVANICHI, an individual

JAMIE KOZ, an individual, AKA White Lightning

Defendant / Appellants

ELIE BRAIDI, an individual, AKA Elie Braidy

SPENCER KUSHNER, an individual

BOULEVARD NIGHTLIFE GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company, AKA Hemmingways, DBA The Study

FREDDY BRAIDI, an individual, AKA Freddy Braidy

Plaintiff / Appellee

MARK ANTHONY DAVIS, an individual, AKA Quie Anthony, AKA QBwoy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Jacques Tushinsky Fox

Attorney at Law Offices of J.T. Fox

556 South Fair Oak Avenue, Suite 444

Pasadena, CA 91105

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Taylor James Howard Esquire

Attorney at AEI Law PC

7755 Center Avenue Suite 1100

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #5

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#2

#4

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 12/02/2020, 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellants Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC, Elie Braidi, Freddy Braidi and Spencer Kushner opening brief due 01/29/2021. Appellee Mark Anthony Davis answering brief due 03/01/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11876650] (BLS) [Entered: 10/30/2020 06:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC, Elie Braidi, Freddy Braidi and Spencer Kushner Correspondence: Correspondent to Court - 9th Circuit Rule - 10-3.1 Statement. Date of service: 10/21/2020 [11872279] [20-55975] (Tushinsky Fox, Jacques) [Entered: 10/26/2020 05:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/28/2020, 10:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11840818] (BLS) [Entered: 09/29/2020 12:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/28/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11839116]. [20-55975] (AD) [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Mark Anthony Davis Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/28/2020. [11838804] [20-55975] (Howard, Taylor) [Entered: 09/28/2020 11:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/25/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11837149]. [20-55975] (AD) [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC, Elie Braidi, Freddy Braidi and Spencer Kushner Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/25/2020. [11837111] [20-55975] (Tushinsky Fox, Jacques) [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC, Elie Braidi, Freddy Braidi and Spencer Kushner Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/29/2020. Transcript ordered by 10/21/2020. Transcript due 11/20/2020. Appellants Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC, Elie Braidi, Freddy Braidi and Spencer Kushner opening brief due 12/30/2020. Appellee Mark Anthony Davis answering brief due 01/29/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11832671] (JBS) [Entered: 09/22/2020 11:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less