This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/14/2021 at 06:09:32 (UTC).

Mark Allen, et al v. 3M Company, et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Mark Allen filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1843

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Brian Bullock

Mark Allen

Dean Clark

Billy Eaves

Don Gambrel

Travis Birden

Jonathan Ball

Michael Scroggie

Robert Burress

Dave Gould

Rocky Hoffman

Zeb Khan

Michael Berg

Shaunda Robb

Timothy Jenkins

Ronda Rouse

Randall Mathias

Jason Mansfield

Defendant / Appellants

Aearo Technologies LLC

3M Company

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew James Barber

Attorney at SCHWEBEL & GOETZ

5120 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2246

Amanda M. Williams

Attorney at GUSTAFSON & GLUEK

Suite 2600, 120 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

William R. Sieben

Attorney at SCHWEBEL & GOETZ

5120 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2246

Daniel E. Gustafson

Attorney at GUSTAFSON & GLUEK

Suite 2600, 120 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Alicia N. Sieben

Attorney at SCHWEBEL & GOETZ

5120 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2246

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jerry Blackwell

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Faris A. Rashid

Attorney at GREENE & ESPEL

Suite 2200, 222 S. Ninth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Benjamin Winters Hulse

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

S. Jamal Faleel

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Andrew Crowder

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195. No Transcript[5042298] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195 - Separate Appendix - w/service 06/04/2021 [5042295] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195. - FOR CAL [5042291] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket**CONSOLIDATED** BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 07/06/2021. Appendix due 07/16/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 07/16/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5040092] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (MMH) [Entered: 05/27/2021 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketRECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #29 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 03/10/2021, No. of Pgs.: 18, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [5030442] [21-1843] (STL) [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850 - Separate Appendix - w/service 04/22/2021 [5028257] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (BWH) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850. - FOR CAL [5028255] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (BWH) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Mark Allen, Mr. Aurelio Arteaga, Mr. Jonathan Ball, Mr. Rafael Benavides, Mr. Michael Berg, Mr. Travis Birden, Mr. Dean Blanchard, Mr. Brian Bullock, Mr. Robert Burress, Mr. Anthony Cain, Mr. Arturo Castellano, Jr., Mr. Michael Church, Mr. Dean Clark, Mr. Dejuan Davis, Ms. Lynda Delaney, Mr. Matthew Diamond, Mr. Billy Eaves, Mr. William Ellenberger, Jr., Mr. Don Gambrel, Mr. Jason Gent, Mr. Robert Gilboy, Mr. Dave Gould, Mr. Malthius Harris, Mr. Kevin Hescott, Mr. Rocky Hoffman, Jessica Horton, Mr. Timothy Jenkins, Ms. Melissa Jones, Ms. Patricia Jones, Tom Jones, Mr. Zeb Khan, Mr. Eric Knight, Mr. Matthew Larson, Mr. Jason Mansfield, Mr. Randall Mathias, Balam Mendoza, Mr. Brady Nuzum, Mr. Wade Obear, Mr. Timmy Potter, Ms. Shaunda Robb, Ms. Ronda Rouse, Mr. Michael Scroggie, Mr. Michael Skelly, Mr. Scott Spradling and Melvin White w/service 04/19/2021 [5026750] [21-1843] (DEG) [Entered: 04/19/2021 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jerry W. Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026685] [21-1843] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Andrew J. Crowder for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026684] [21-1843] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026682] [21-1843] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*CONSOLIDATED* BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 05/26/2021. Appendix due 06/07/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 06/07/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5026322] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (CBO) [Entered: 04/16/2021 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of docket entries, memorandum opinion and order granting remand filed 3/24/2021, amended judgment filed 3/25/2021, and notice of appeal filed 4/13/2021. [5026042] [21-1843] (CBO) [Entered: 04/15/2021 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5026036] [21-1843] (CBO) [Entered: 04/15/2021 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Crowder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerry Blackwell