This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2019 at 06:03:39 (UTC).

Marion Norwood v. United States

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Marion Norwood filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3001

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

United States of America

Petitioner / Appellant

Marion Anthony Norwood

Oakdale, LA 71463-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Brian Patrick Casey

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

5510 Charles Evans Whittaker Courthouse, 400 E. Ninth Street

Kansas City, MO 64106-2149

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Marion Anthony Norwood

Attorney at FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 5000

Oakdale, LA 71463-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

COA's cc'd Copy of NOA

Open Document

CLERK LETTER sent regarding petitioners request for itemized listing of the records..***Additonally, copy of the public docket sheet sent to petitioner [4851342] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:44 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Letter

Open Document #2

Acknowledge Amended NOA

Open Document #1

Amended NOA

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 10/22/2019 granting appellant's motion for reconsideration, [4849062] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:20 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:motion to supplement record filed by Appellant Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood in 19-3001 , [ # 4848787-2 ] is hereby ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which this case is submitted for disposition on the merits. - FOR CAL [4848790] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 11/04/2019 04:22 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Letter

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Motion

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Application for COA

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Letter

Open Restricted Document #2

ProSe NDA

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT FILED - COA's cc'd copy of NOA filed in the DC by Mr. Norwood. w/service 11/15/2019 [4852837] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 11/15/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK LETTER sent regarding petitioners request for itemized listing of the records..***Additonally, copy of the public docket sheet sent to petitioner [4851342] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER from Appellant Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood requesting an itemized listing of the records. w/service 11/12/2019 [4851332] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of amended notice of appeal, docket entries. [4849906] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 11/07/2019 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 10/22/2019 granting appellant's motion for reconsideration, [4849062] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:motion to supplement record filed by Appellant Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood in 19-3001 , [ # 4848787-2 ] is hereby ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which this case is submitted for disposition on the merits. - FOR CAL [4848790] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 11/04/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER from Appellant Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood regarding returned copies. w/service 11/04/2019 [4848786] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 11/04/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to supplement the record., filed by Appellant Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood w/service 11/04/2019. [4848787] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 11/04/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION for Certificate of Appealability, filed by Appellant Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood w/service 10/18/2019 [4845603] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 10/25/2019 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER from Appellant Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood wanting an updated case status. w/service 10/18/2019. All of his concerns have been address in previous communication. Copy of the public docket sheet mailed with NDA. [4843430]-text edited-[Edited 10/18/2019 by RLS] (RLS) [Entered: 10/18/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Party Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood w/service 10/18/2019. [4843271] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 10/18/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Denying as moot [ # 4839866-2 ] motion ext of time to file document filed by Appellant Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood. Appellant's request has already been address in the 10/07/2019 order.[4839869] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 10/09/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file to submit IFP and application for COA [4839866], filed by Appellant Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood w/service 10/09/2019. [4839866] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 10/09/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER from Appellant Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood requesting "notice to prose litigants" and copy of the courts docket sheet. w/service 10/07/2019 [4838487] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 10/07/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting in Part [ # 4838463-2 ] motion ext of time to file document filed by Appellant Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood. Appellant has until 10/21/2019 to file his COA. [4838475] [4838475] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file to File COA until 10/21/2019[4838463], filed by Appellant Mr. Marion Anthony Norwood w/service 10/07/2019 [4838463] [19-3001]Title of motion edited from appeal to COA]--[Edited 10/07/2019 by RLS]--[Edited 10/10/2019 by EDG to correct the file date] (RLS) [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4831635] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 09/17/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order dated 08/07/2019, and judgment dated 08/07/2019.[4831608] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 09/17/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4831592] [19-3001] (RLS) [Entered: 09/17/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less