This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 06:05:02 (UTC).

Marion Kilburn v. Anna Valentine

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 Marion Kilburn filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Anna Valentine. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5711

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

ANNA VALENTINE, Warden

Petitioner / Appellant

MARION KILBURN

Lagrange, KY 40032

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Kenneth W. Riggs

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1024 Capital Center Drive, Suite 200

Frankfort, KY 40601

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Marion Kilburn

Attorney at Kentucky State Reformatory

3001 W. Highway 146

Lagrange, KY 40032

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Marion Kilburn. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:37 PM]

4 #2

form(s) sent

4 #1

DC Denial With Time

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Marion Kilburn to extend time to file a motion for certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 07/16/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:56 PM]

#9

(#9) RULING LETTER SENT declaring as moot the motion to extend time to file a motion for a certificate of appealability [ # 8 ] filed by Mr. Marion Kilburn. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:00 PM]

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Marion Kilburn to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 07/16/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:52 PM]

#3

(#3) Copy of District Court Order filed 7/2/2019, R. 28 denying in forma pauperis.--[Edited 07/02/2019 by ASM] (ASM) [Entered: 07/02/2019 01:49 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULING LETTER SENT declaring as moot the motion to extend time to file a motion for a certificate of appealability [ # 8 ] filed by Mr. Marion Kilburn. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Marion Kilburn to extend time to file a motion for certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 07/16/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Prisoner trust account statement filed. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Financial Affidavit filed by Party Mr. Marion Kilburn Certificate of Service: 07/16/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Marion Kilburn to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 07/16/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. Appellant has until August 1, 2019 to either pay the filing fee to the District Court, or file IFP motion and affidavit in Sixth Circuit. (ASM) [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Copy of District Court Order filed 7/2/2019, R. 28 denying in forma pauperis.--[Edited 07/02/2019 by ASM] (ASM) [Entered: 07/02/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Marion Kilburn. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.