This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/21/2022 at 05:25:37 (UTC).

Mario Maranon v. Scottsdale Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Mario Maranon filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-11651

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARIO MARANON

Defendant / Appellee

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Aristides Juan Diaz

Attorney at Your Insurance Attorney, PLLC

250 N Orange Ave Ste 605

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ronald L. Kammer

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Fl 4

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Joseph Vincent Manzo

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Fl 4

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Tyler Charles Thompson

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Fl 4

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Sean William Rolland

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP

111 N Orange Ave Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

ORDER DE# 45

Open Document #4

FINAL JUDGMENT DE# 46

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Mario Maranon on 05/11/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/21/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/31/2022 as to Appellant Mario Maranon. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/14/2022 as to Appellee Scottsdale Insurance Company [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean William Rolland