This case was last updated from PACER on 03/11/2021 at 03:01:47 (UTC).

Seigler v. Wal-Mart Stores TX

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Seigler filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores TX. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11080

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Maria Seigler

Defendant / Appellee

Wal-Mart Stores Texas, L.L.C., doing business as Walmart Supercenter #963

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Walter L. Taylor

Attorney at Hart Law Firm, P.L.L.C.

6630 Colleyville Boulevard

Colleyville, TX 76034

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ramona Martinez

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward, P.L.L.C.

1700 Pacific Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Katherine Elrich

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward, P.L.L.C.

1700 Pacific Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellee's brief filed by Appellee Wal-Mart Stores Texas, L.L.C. [ # 9486591-2 ] Appellee's Brief due on 03/12/2021 for Appellee Wal-Mart Stores Texas, L.L.C. [20-11080] (RAJ) [Entered: 01/21/2021 12:39 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Wal-Mart Stores Texas, L.L.C. to extend time to file brief of appellee until 03/12/2021 [9486591-2]. Date of service: 01/21/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Elrich, Martinez; Attorney for Appellant: Taylor [20-11080] (Katherine Elrich ) [Entered: 01/21/2021 11:46 AM]

Open Document

RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 [20-11080] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Maria Seigler. Date of service: 01/11/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Elrich, Martinez; Attorney for Appellant: Taylor [20-11080] (Walter L. Taylor ) [Entered: 01/11/2021 06:05 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 02/10/2021 for Appellee Wal-Mart Stores Texas, L.L.C. [20-11080] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Maria Seigler. Date of service: 01/11/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Elrich, Martinez; Attorney for Appellant: Taylor [20-11080] (Walter L. Taylor ) [Entered: 01/11/2021 06:04 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Ms. Maria Seigler [ # 9464577-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 01/11/2021 for Appellant Maria Seigler [20-11080] (RAJ) [Entered: 12/17/2020 08:34 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Maria Seigler to extend time to file brief as appellant until 01/11/2021 [9464577-2]. Date of service: 12/16/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Elrich, Martinez; Attorney for Appellant: Taylor [20-11080] (Walter L. Taylor ) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:38 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11080] (Katherine Elrich ) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:19 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/21/2020 for Appellant Maria Seigler. [20-11080] (AGL) [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:42 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Walter L. Taylor for Ms. Maria Seigler for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11080] (Walter L. Taylor ) [Entered: 11/06/2020 09:28 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9435510-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-11080] (RSM) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:33 AM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Maria Seigler [20-11080] (LEF) [Entered: 10/26/2020 09:35 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellee's brief filed by Appellee Wal-Mart Stores Texas, L.L.C. [ # 9486591-2 ] Appellee's Brief due on 03/12/2021 for Appellee Wal-Mart Stores Texas, L.L.C. [20-11080] (RAJ) [Entered: 01/21/2021 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Wal-Mart Stores Texas, L.L.C. to extend time to file brief of appellee until 03/12/2021 [9486591-2]. Date of service: 01/21/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Elrich, Martinez; Attorney for Appellant: Taylor [20-11080] (Katherine Elrich ) [Entered: 01/21/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 [20-11080] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Maria Seigler. Date of service: 01/11/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Elrich, Martinez; Attorney for Appellant: Taylor [20-11080] (Walter L. Taylor ) [Entered: 01/11/2021 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 02/10/2021 for Appellee Wal-Mart Stores Texas, L.L.C. [20-11080] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Maria Seigler. Date of service: 01/11/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Elrich, Martinez; Attorney for Appellant: Taylor [20-11080] (Walter L. Taylor ) [Entered: 01/11/2021 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Ms. Maria Seigler [ # 9464577-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 01/11/2021 for Appellant Maria Seigler [20-11080] (RAJ) [Entered: 12/17/2020 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Maria Seigler to extend time to file brief as appellant until 01/11/2021 [9464577-2]. Date of service: 12/16/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Elrich, Martinez; Attorney for Appellant: Taylor [20-11080] (Walter L. Taylor ) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Katherine Elrich for party(s) Appellee Wal-Mart Stores Texas, L.L.C., in case 20-11080 [20-11080] (CNF) [Entered: 11/19/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11080] (Katherine Elrich ) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/21/2020 for Appellant Maria Seigler. [20-11080] (AGL) [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-11080] (AGL) [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Walter L. Taylor for Appellant Maria Seigler in 20-11080 [20-11080] (RSM) [Entered: 11/06/2020 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Walter L. Taylor for Ms. Maria Seigler for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11080] (Walter L. Taylor ) [Entered: 11/06/2020 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:19-CV-998. Electronic ROA due on 11/19/2020. [20-11080] (RSM) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9435510-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-11080] (RSM) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Maria Seigler [20-11080] (LEF) [Entered: 10/26/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine K Elrich

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramona Martinez