This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/22/2020 at 06:34:34 (UTC).

Maria Quezambra v. UDW/AFSCME Local 3930, et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2020 Maria Quezambra filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against UDW/AFSCME Local 3930,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55643

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED DOMESTIC WORKERS OF AMERICA, AFSCME LOCAL 3930, a labor organization

ORANGE COUNTY, a political subdivision of he State of California

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California

BETTY T. YEE, in her official capacity as State Controller of the State of California

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARIA QUEZAMBRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Rebecca Moryl Lee

Scott A. Kronland

Michael L. Wroniak Esquire

Lara Haddad

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James G. Abernathy

Karin Sweigart

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Maria Quezambra Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 11/20/2020. Date of service: 08/20/2020. [11796257] [20-55643] (Abernathy, James) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#6) Streamlined request [5] by Appellant Maria Quezambra to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Maria Quezambra opening brief due 09/21/2020. Appellees Xavier Becerra, Orange County, United Domestic Workers of America, AFSCME Local 3930 and Betty T. Yee answering brief due 10/21/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11793198] (BG) [Entered: 08/18/2020 11:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Maria Quezambra. New requested due date is 09/21/2020. [11793170] [20-55643] (Sweigart, Karin) [Entered: 08/18/2020 11:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or circumstances develop that might warrant settlement discussions. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11739743] (CL) [Entered: 07/01/2020 12:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/30/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11738271]. [20-55643] (AD) [Entered: 06/30/2020 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Maria Quezambra Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/30/2020. [11738142] [20-55643] (Sweigart, Karin) [Entered: 06/30/2020 11:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Maria Quezambra Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/30/2020. Appellant Maria Quezambra opening brief due 08/21/2020. Appellees Xavier Becerra, Orange County, United Domestic Workers of America, AFSCME Local 3930 and Betty T. Yee answering brief due 09/21/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11730848] (JBS) [Entered: 06/23/2020 01:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less