This case was last updated from PACER on 05/21/2019 at 09:31:29 (UTC).

Maria Gracia v. SigmaTron International, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Maria Gracia filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against SigmaTron International, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1526

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

LINDA FRAUENDORFER

GARY FAIRHEAD

SIGMATRON INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARIA N. GRACIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Tiffany Carpenter

Attorney at HOWARD & HOWARD ATTORNEYS PLLC

200 S. Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60604

Michael O. Fawaz

Attorney at HOWARD & HOWARD ATTORNEYS PLLC

450 W. Fourth Street

Royal Oak, MI 48067

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kathryn E. Korn

Attorney at KATHRYN E. KORN LAW OFFICE

8501 W. Higgins Road

Chicago, IL 60631-2811

Hall Adams III

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HALL ADAMS LLC

33 N. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60602-3102

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/31/2019 for Maria N. Gracia. Appellee's brief due on or before 09/16/2019 for Gary Fairhead, Linda Frauendorfer and SigmaTron International, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/10/2019 for Appellant Maria N. Gracia. JB [7004786] [19-1526] (FP) [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:19 AM]

#10

(#10) ORDER: The Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement rule to show cause order issued on May 14, 2019 is VACATED as erroneously issued. A docketing statement was filed on March 29, 2019. JR [10] [7004603] [19-1526] (PS) [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:38 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/17/2019 for Maria N. Gracia. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/31/2019 for Gary Fairhead, Linda Frauendorfer and SigmaTron International, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/21/2019 for Appellant Maria N. Gracia. JB [7004524] [19-1526] (FP) [Entered: 05/14/2019 12:32 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER: Appellant Maria N. Gracia is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Maria N. Gracia by 05/28/2019. [8] [7004483] [19-1526] (VG) [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:39 AM]

#7

(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/03/2019 for Maria N. Gracia. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/03/2019 for Gary Fairhead, Linda Frauendorfer and SigmaTron International, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/24/2019 for Appellant Maria N. Gracia JNS [6996156] [19-1526] (FP) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:53 AM]

6 #2

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Hall Adams for Appellant Maria N. Gracia. [6] [6995087] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1526] [Edited 04/03/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Adams, Hall) [Entered: 04/03/2019 11:54 AM]

6 #1

Disclosure Statement/Appearance

#5

(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/28/2019 for Maria N. Gracia. Appellees' brief due on or before 06/27/2019 for Gary Fairhead, Linda Frauendorfer and SigmaTron International, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/18/2019 for Appellant Maria N. Gracia. JNS [6994157] [19-1526] (PS) [Entered: 03/29/2019 12:32 PM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Maria N. Gracia. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 15-3311 [3] [6994107] [19-1526]--[Entry updated 05/14/2019 by JR to reflect correct document description.] (Korn, Kathryn) [Entered: 03/29/2019 11:11 AM]

#4

(#4) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Friday, April 26, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [4] [6994156] [19-1526] (PS) [Entered: 03/29/2019 12:26 PM]

#2

(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael O. Fawaz for Appellee SigmaTron International, Inc.. [2] [6993568] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1526]-[Edited 03/27/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Fawaz, Michael) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:20 PM]

2 #1

Disclosure Statement/Appearance

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/31/2019 for Maria N. Gracia. Appellee's brief due on or before 09/16/2019 for Gary Fairhead, Linda Frauendorfer and SigmaTron International, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/10/2019 for Appellant Maria N. Gracia. JB [7004786] [19-1526] (FP) [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: The Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement rule to show cause order issued on May 14, 2019 is VACATED as erroneously issued. A docketing statement was filed on March 29, 2019. JR [10] [7004603] [19-1526] (PS) [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/17/2019 for Maria N. Gracia. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/31/2019 for Gary Fairhead, Linda Frauendorfer and SigmaTron International, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/21/2019 for Appellant Maria N. Gracia. JB [7004524] [19-1526] (FP) [Entered: 05/14/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: Appellant Maria N. Gracia is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Maria N. Gracia by 05/28/2019. [8] [7004483] [19-1526] (VG) [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/03/2019 for Maria N. Gracia. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/03/2019 for Gary Fairhead, Linda Frauendorfer and SigmaTron International, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/24/2019 for Appellant Maria N. Gracia JNS [6996156] [19-1526] (FP) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Hall Adams for Appellant Maria N. Gracia. [6] [6995087] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1526] [Edited 04/03/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Adams, Hall) [Entered: 04/03/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/28/2019 for Maria N. Gracia. Appellees' brief due on or before 06/27/2019 for Gary Fairhead, Linda Frauendorfer and SigmaTron International, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/18/2019 for Appellant Maria N. Gracia. JNS [6994157] [19-1526] (PS) [Entered: 03/29/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Maria N. Gracia. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 15-3311 [3] [6994107] [19-1526]--[Entry updated 05/14/2019 by JR to reflect correct document description.] (Korn, Kathryn) [Entered: 03/29/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Friday, April 26, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [4] [6994156] [19-1526] (PS) [Entered: 03/29/2019 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael O. Fawaz for Appellee SigmaTron International, Inc.. [2] [6993568] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1526]-[Edited 03/27/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Fawaz, Michael) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Maria N. Gracia by 03/29/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 04/05/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/01/2019 for Maria N. Gracia. [1] [6992804] [19-1526] (VG) [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less