This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2019 at 06:09:41 (UTC).

Maria Antonio v. Progressive Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Maria Antonio filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Progressive Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1074

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE CO

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARIA ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert E. Dapper Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Burns White

48 26Th Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Kathleen P. Dapper Esq.

Attorney at Burns White

1001 Conshohocken State Road, 100 Four Falls, Suite 515

West Conshohocken, PA 19428

Daniel J. Twilla Esq.

Attorney at Burns White

48 26Th Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Bruce L. Neff Esq.

Attorney at Neff & Associates

1500 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Two Penn Center Plaza, Suite 1212

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Martin J. Beck Esq.

Attorney at Neff & Associates

1500 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Two Penn Center Plaza, Suite 1212

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

Open Restricted Document #1

Mediation Instructions

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Progressive Insurance Co, filed. [19-1074] (RED) [Entered: 02/26/2019 06:00 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert E. Dapper, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Progressive Insurance Company. [19-1074] (RED) [Entered: 02/26/2019 05:58 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kathleen P. Dapper, Esq. for Progressive Insurance Co, Robert E. Dapper, Jr., Esq. for Progressive Insurance Co and Daniel J. Twilla, Esq. for Progressive Insurance Co requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/26/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 02/26/2019. (JK) [Entered: 02/12/2019 03:22 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part III) filed by SHANNAN GAGLIARDI, OCR. for the date(s) of 12/3/2018, 12/4/2018, 12/6/2018 AND 12/7/2018. Transcripts were filed in the District Court on 02/08/2019. [19-1074] (JMG) [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:38 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part II) filed by SHANNAN GAGLIARDI, OCR for date(s) of 12/3/18 THRU 12/7/18. [19-1074] (JC) [Entered: 01/28/2019 04:33 PM]

Open Document #1

Transcript Purchase Order

Open Document #2

Transcript Scheduling Order

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Martin J. Beck, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Maria Antonio. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:11 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Maria Antonio, filed. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:10 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Maria Antonio advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: 12/3/18-12/7/18, to be filed by Shannan Gagliardi. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:08 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Maria Antonio, received. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:03 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bruce L. Neff, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Maria Antonio. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:00 PM]

Open Document #4

Notice of Appeal

Open Document #5

ORDER

Open Document #2

Case Caption

Open Document #3

STANDING ORDER

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Progressive Insurance Co, filed. [19-1074] (RED) [Entered: 02/26/2019 06:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert E. Dapper, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Progressive Insurance Company. [19-1074] (RED) [Entered: 02/26/2019 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kathleen P. Dapper, Esq. for Progressive Insurance Co, Robert E. Dapper, Jr., Esq. for Progressive Insurance Co and Daniel J. Twilla, Esq. for Progressive Insurance Co requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/26/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 02/26/2019. (JK) [Entered: 02/12/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part III) filed by SHANNAN GAGLIARDI, OCR. for the date(s) of 12/3/2018, 12/4/2018, 12/6/2018 AND 12/7/2018. Transcripts were filed in the District Court on 02/08/2019. [19-1074] (JMG) [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part II) filed by SHANNAN GAGLIARDI, OCR for date(s) of 12/3/18 THRU 12/7/18. [19-1074] (JC) [Entered: 01/28/2019 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER to Court Reporter Ms. Joan Carr directing transcripts, ordered on 01/22/2019 , to be filed by 02/25/2019. (CJG) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Martin J. Beck, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Maria Antonio. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Maria Antonio, filed. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Maria Antonio advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: 12/3/18-12/7/18, to be filed by Shannan Gagliardi. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Maria Antonio, received. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bruce L. Neff, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Maria Antonio. [19-1074] (BLN) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Maria Antonio in District Court No. 2-16-cv-06055. (LMR) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.