This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/08/2020 at 06:14:27 (UTC).

Margo Schiewe v. SEIU Local 503, et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Margo Schiewe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SEIU Local 503. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-35882

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

KATY COBA, in her official capacity as Director of the Oregon Department of Administrative Services

DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES

SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 503, a labor organization

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARGO CASH SCHIEWE, an individual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sadie Forzley

Attorney at OREGON DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

100 Sw Market Street

Portland, OR 97201

Denise Gale Fjordbeck

Attorney at Oregon Department of Justice

1162 Court Street N.E.

Salem, OR 97301

Rebecca Moryl Lee

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

James S. Coon Esquire

Attorney at Swanson, Thomas, Coon & Newton

820 Southwest Second Avenue

Portland, OR 97204

Scott A. Kronland

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James G. Abernathy

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Rebekah Millard

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Margo Cash Schiewe. Date of service: 12/07/2020. [11917953] [20-35882] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 12/07/2020 08:25 PM]

#10

(#10) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Margo Cash Schiewe. Date of service: 12/07/2020. [11917952] [20-35882] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 12/07/2020 08:23 PM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11886850] (CL) [Entered: 11/09/2020 02:44 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/06/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11869706] (CL) [Entered: 10/23/2020 10:29 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Margo Cash Schiewe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/14/2020. [11859128] [20-35882] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 10/14/2020 05:10 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Margo Cash Schiewe. Date of service: 12/07/2020. [11917953] [20-35882] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 12/07/2020 08:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Margo Cash Schiewe. Date of service: 12/07/2020. [11917952] [20-35882] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 12/07/2020 08:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11886850] (CL) [Entered: 11/09/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docket(#8) Terminated Rebecca Moryl Lee for Service Employees International Union Local 503 in 20-35882 [11881691] (QDL) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Rebecca Moryl Lee for Appellee Service Employees International Union Local 503. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 11/04/2020. [11881677] [20-35882] (Lee, Rebecca) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/06/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11869706] (CL) [Entered: 10/23/2020 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Sadie Forzley in 20-35882 substituted by Attorney Denise Gale Fjordbeck in 20-35882 [11864521] (QDL) [Entered: 10/19/2020 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Denise G. Fjordbeck (Oregon Department of Justice - Appellate Division, 1162 Court Street NE, Salem, Oregon 97301) for Appellees Department of Administrative Services and Katy Coba. Substitution for Attorney Sadie Forzley for Appellees Katy Coba and Department of Administrative Services. Date of service: 10/19/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11864505] [20-35882] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 10/19/2020 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/14/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11859239]. [20-35882] (AD) [Entered: 10/14/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Margo Cash Schiewe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/14/2020. [11859128] [20-35882] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 10/14/2020 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Margo Cash Schiewe Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/16/2020. Appellant Margo Cash Schiewe opening brief due 12/07/2020. Appellees Katy Coba, Department of Administrative Services and Service Employees International Union Local 503 answering brief due 01/06/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11853617] (JBS) [Entered: 10/09/2020 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Administrative Services is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant