This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/30/2022 at 06:05:25 (UTC).

Marcus Todd v. AFSCME

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 Marcus Todd filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AFSCME. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3749

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Marcus Todd

Defendant / Appellee

American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James Dickey

Attorney at UPPER MIDWEST LAW CENTER

Suite 300, 8421 Wayzata Boulevard

Golden Valley, MN 55426

Douglas Seaton

Attorney at UPPER MIDWEST LAW CENTER

Suite 300, 8421 Wayzata Boulevard

Golden Valley, MN 55426

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Leon Dayan

Attorney at BREDHOFF & KAISER

Suite 1000, 805 15Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-0000

Josie Doris Hegarty

Attorney at AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES

300 Hardman Avenue, S.

South Saint Paul, MN 55075

Jacob Karabell

Suite 1000, 805 15Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-0000

Jacob R. Karabell

Attorney at BREDHOFF & KAISER

Suite 1000, 805 15Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [5103602] [21-3749] (ASL) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:14 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order of 11/10/2021, Judgment of 11/12/2021, and docket entries, [5103618] [21-3749] (ASL) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:21 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Original file of originating court shall serve as record on appeal. Appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. Clerk of originating court is requested to forward the file forthwith, together with any exhibits and documents maintained in paper format.. Transcript due on or before 01/10/2022. Appendix due 01/20/2022. BRIEF APPELLANT, Marcus Todd due 01/20/2022 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5103644] [21-3749] (ASL) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:35 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Leon Dayan for Appellee AFSCME w/service 12/06/2021 [5104937] [21-3749] (LD) [Entered: 12/06/2021 12:43 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee AFSCME. - FOR CAL [5104938] [21-3749] (LD) [Entered: 12/06/2021 12:45 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Josie Hegarty for Appellee AFSCME w/service 12/08/2021 [5105845] [21-3749] (JDH) [Entered: 12/08/2021 11:30 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jacob Karabell for Appellee AFSCME w/service 12/10/2021 [5106852] [21-3749] (JRK) [Entered: 12/10/2021 01:38 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Marcus Todd - Joint Appendix - w/service 12/10/2021 [5106878] [21-3749] (JD) [Entered: 12/10/2021 02:19 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Marcus Todd. w/service 12/10/2021 [5106886] [21-3749] (JD) [Entered: 12/10/2021 02:26 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Marcus Todd - w/service 12/13/2021. [5107449] [21-3749] (JD) [Entered: 12/13/2021 02:38 PM]

Open Document

LETTER from Appellee AFSCME regarding Notice Pursuant to Court Rule 34B. w/service 12/14/2021 [5107780] [21-3749] (JRK) [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:15 AM]

Open Document

CLERK LETTER responding to AFSCME Notice pursuant to Rule 34B. [5108087] [21-3749, 21-1366, 21-1372] (HAG) [Entered: 12/14/2021 03:42 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to hold case in abeyance, filed by Attorney Mr. Jacob R. Karabell for Appellee AFSCME w/service 12/16/2021. [5108850] [21-3749]--[Edited to correct filing relief 12/16/2021 by AMT] (JRK) [Entered: 12/16/2021 12:01 PM]

Open Document

CLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance pending the disposition of appellee's motion to hold the case in abeyance. [5108916] [21-3749] (HAG) [Entered: 12/16/2021 02:18 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE in opposition to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 5108850-2 ] filed by Mr. James Dickey for Appellant Marcus Todd and Mr. Douglas Seaton for Appellant Marcus Todd , w/service 12/27/2021. [5111624] [21-3749] (JD) [Entered: 12/27/2021 06:28 PM]

Open Document

JUDGE ORDER: Appellee AFSCMEs [ # 5108850-2 ] motion to hold this appeal in abeyance has been considered by the court, and the motion is denied. Appellants brief is due February 8, 2022. This case will be assigned to the panel scheduled to hear the related Hoekman and Piekarski appeals Nos. 21-1366/1372 and Nos. 21-2675/2687. In briefing the Todd case, counsel may incorporate, by reference or otherwise, their briefing of common issues in the related appeals. A decision as to whether oral argument is needed on the non-common issues presented by Todd will be deferred until briefing is completed. Counsel will be advised of the oral argument date for the Hoekman and Piekarski appeals when they are assigned to an oral argument calendar. Argument of the cases will not be delayed pending the completion of briefing in Todd. Special Dec 2021 [5113840] [21-3749] (HAG) [Entered: 01/04/2022 10:34 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE ORDER: Appellee AFSCMEs [ # 5108850-2 ] motion to hold this appeal in abeyance has been considered by the court, and the motion is denied. Appellants brief is due February 8, 2022. This case will be assigned to the panel scheduled to hear the related Hoekman and Piekarski appeals Nos. 21-1366/1372 and Nos. 21-2675/2687. In briefing the Todd case, counsel may incorporate, by reference or otherwise, their briefing of common issues in the related appeals. A decision as to whether oral argument is needed on the non-common issues presented by Todd will be deferred until briefing is completed. Counsel will be advised of the oral argument date for the Hoekman and Piekarski appeals when they are assigned to an oral argument calendar. Argument of the cases will not be delayed pending the completion of briefing in Todd. Special Dec 2021 [5113840] [21-3749] (HAG) [Entered: 01/04/2022 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE in opposition to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 5108850-2 ] filed by Mr. James Dickey for Appellant Marcus Todd and Mr. Douglas Seaton for Appellant Marcus Todd , w/service 12/27/2021. [5111624] [21-3749] (JD) [Entered: 12/27/2021 06:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance pending the disposition of appellee's motion to hold the case in abeyance. [5108916] [21-3749] (HAG) [Entered: 12/16/2021 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to hold case in abeyance, filed by Attorney Mr. Jacob R. Karabell for Appellee AFSCME w/service 12/16/2021. [5108850] [21-3749]--[Edited to correct filing relief 12/16/2021 by AMT] (JRK) [Entered: 12/16/2021 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK LETTER responding to AFSCME Notice pursuant to Rule 34B. [5108087] [21-3749, 21-1366, 21-1372] (HAG) [Entered: 12/14/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER from Appellee AFSCME regarding Notice Pursuant to Court Rule 34B. w/service 12/14/2021 [5107780] [21-3749] (JRK) [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Marcus Todd - w/service 12/13/2021. [5107449] [21-3749] (JD) [Entered: 12/13/2021 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Marcus Todd. w/service 12/10/2021 [5106886] [21-3749] (JD) [Entered: 12/10/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Marcus Todd - Joint Appendix - w/service 12/10/2021 [5106878] [21-3749] (JD) [Entered: 12/10/2021 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jacob Karabell for Appellee AFSCME w/service 12/10/2021 [5106852] [21-3749] (JRK) [Entered: 12/10/2021 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Josie Hegarty for Appellee AFSCME w/service 12/08/2021 [5105845] [21-3749] (JDH) [Entered: 12/08/2021 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee AFSCME. - FOR CAL [5104938] [21-3749] (LD) [Entered: 12/06/2021 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Leon Dayan for Appellee AFSCME w/service 12/06/2021 [5104937] [21-3749] (LD) [Entered: 12/06/2021 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Original file of originating court shall serve as record on appeal. Appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. Clerk of originating court is requested to forward the file forthwith, together with any exhibits and documents maintained in paper format.. Transcript due on or before 01/10/2022. Appendix due 01/20/2022. BRIEF APPELLANT, Marcus Todd due 01/20/2022 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5103644] [21-3749] (ASL) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order of 11/10/2021, Judgment of 11/12/2021, and docket entries, [5103618] [21-3749] (ASL) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5103602] [21-3749] (ASL) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES LOCAL 619 DISTRICT COUNCIL 36 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leon Dayan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Karabell