This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/24/2022 at 05:23:33 (UTC).

Marcus Foster v. Midfirst Bank, et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Marcus Foster filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Midfirst Bank. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15923

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARCUS R. FOSTER

Henderson, NV 89015

Defendant / Appellees

MIDFIRST BANK

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Marcus R. Foster

420 Groft Way

Henderson, NV 89015

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz

Attorney at McCarthy & Holthus, LLP

9510 W. Sahara Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89117

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 07/18/2022. Transcript due 08/16/2022. Appellant Marcus R. Foster opening brief due 09/26/2022. Appellees Midfirst Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems and Quality Loan Service Corporation answering brief due 10/25/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12476860] (JMR) [Entered: 06/22/2022 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midfirst Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant