This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 05:30:44 (UTC).

Marcos Araujo, et al v. U.S. Attorney General

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Marcos Araujo filed an Other lawsuit against U S Attorney General. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-10537

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MARCOS ARAUJO

Doral, FL 33178

FERNANDA GOMES ARAUJO

Respondent

U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Marcos Araujo

9865 Nw 87Th Ter

Doral, FL 33178

Respondent Attorneys

OIL

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

450 5Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Michelle Ressler

Attorney at District Counsel's Office

333 S Miami Ave Fl 2

Miami, FL 33130-1904

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Agency Case Docketed - Petition for Review

Open Restricted Document #3

BIA Decision

Open Restricted Document #1

DKT-8BIA Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah L. Martin OIL for U.S. Attorney General. [20-10537] (ECF: Sarah Martin) [Entered: 02/14/2020 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGENCY PETITION / APPLICATION DOCKETED. Filed by Petitioners Fernanda Gomes Araujo and Marcos Araujo. Additional Documents Needed: Immigration judge order and notice to appear. Fee Status: Fee Paid. 02/07/2020. [Entered: 02/13/2020 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.