This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/08/2022 at 06:18:26 (UTC).

Marcia Stein, et al v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 Marcia Stein filed an Other lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15862

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff / Appellants

MARCIA STEIN

RODOLFO BONE, Qui Tam Relators; ex rel. United States of America

Defendant / Appellees

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., a California corporation

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, a California corporation

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF COLORADO, a Colorado corporaton

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF GEORGIA, INC., a Georgia corporation

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF THE MID-ATLANTIC STATES, INC., a Maryland corporation

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF THE NORTHWEST, an Oregon corporation

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF WASHINGTON, a Washington corporation

PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a California corporation

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

COLORADO PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, a Colorado corporation

SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

HAWAII PERMANTE MEDICAL GROUP

MID-ATLANTIC PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

NORTHWEST PERMANENTE, P.C.

GROUP HEALTH PERMANENTE

KAISER PERMANENTE

HAWAII PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Joseph Wolinsky

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

450 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Shiwon Choe

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

450 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Abram Jay Zinberg

Attorney at The Zinberg Law Firm, APC

412 Olive Ave., Suite 528

Huntington Beach, CA 92648

William Kioki Hanagami

Attorney at Hanagami Law, A.P.C.

913 Tahoe Boulevard, Suite 5

Incline Village, NV 89451-7414

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David Jeffrey Leviss

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Stephen Sullivan

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP

400 S Hope Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Caitlin Morrow Bair

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, 28Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Matthew Deaton

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP

400 S Hope Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Dimitri Portnoi

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP

400 S Hope Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Rodolfo Bone and Marcia Stein Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/14/2022. [12471270] [22-15862] (Hanagami, William) [Entered: 06/14/2022 05:28 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/14/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12483742] (CL) [Entered: 06/30/2022 09:28 AM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12500031] (CL) [Entered: 07/22/2022 11:34 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12500031] (CL) [Entered: 07/22/2022 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/14/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12483742] (CL) [Entered: 06/30/2022 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docket(#5) Terminated David Jeffrey Leviss for Southern California Permanente Medical Group, Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Colorado and Colorado Permanente Medical Group. [12474355] (RL) [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Mr. David Jeffrey Leviss for Appellees Colorado Permanente Medical Group, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Colorado, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Permanente Medical Group, Inc. and Southern California Permanente Medical Group. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 06/17/2022. [12474258] [22-15862] (Portnoi, Dimitri) [Entered: 06/17/2022 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/14/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12471298]. [22-15862] (AD) [Entered: 06/14/2022 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Rodolfo Bone and Marcia Stein Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/14/2022. [12471270] [22-15862] (Hanagami, William) [Entered: 06/14/2022 05:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Rodolfo Bone and Marcia Stein Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/16/2022. Transcript ordered by 07/07/2022. Transcript due 08/08/2022. Appellants Rodolfo Bone and Marcia Stein opening brief due 09/15/2022. Appellees Colorado Permanente Medical Group, Group Health Permanente, Hawaii Permante Medical Group, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Colorado, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Georgia, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Kaiser Permanente, Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, Northwest Permanente, P.C., Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Southeast Permanente Medical Group and Southern California Permanente Medical Group answering brief due 10/17/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12467645] (RT) [Entered: 06/09/2022 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hawaii Permante Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where MID-ATLANTIC PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Colorado Permanente Medical Group P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP - TSPMG is a litigant