This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2019 at 06:08:55 (UTC).

Marcelo Alves v. Secretary, Department of Corr., et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 Marcelo Alves filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corr . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11165

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF FLORIDA

SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Petitioner / Appellant

MARCELO AUGUSTO ALVES

Perry, FL 32348

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

444 Seabreeze Blvd Fl 5

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Rebecca Rock McGuigan

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

444 Seabreeze Blvd Fl 5

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Marcelo Augusto Alves

Attorney at Taylor CI Annex - Inmate Legal Mail

8501 Hampton Springs Rd

Perry, FL 32348

 

Court Documents

Open Document #4

DC Judgment appealed Document No. 27

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Marcelo Augusto Alves. [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:07 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Marcelo Augusto Alves. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:36 PM]

Open Restricted Document #1

EXT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #5

DC Order appealed Document No. 30

Open Document

USDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant Marcelo Augusto Alves was filed on 01/09/2019. Docket Entry 26. [Entered: 04/01/2019 11:21 AM]

Open Restricted Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Marcelo Augusto Alves. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:17 AM]

Open Restricted Document #3

Court Order Filed

Open Document #3

DC Order appealed Document No. 26

Open Document #1

HAB-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rebecca Rock McGuigan for Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections. [19-11165] (ECF: Rebecca McGuigan) [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:14 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Rebecca Rock McGuigan for Appellees Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11165] (ECF: Rebecca McGuigan) [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:13 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file a Motion for Certificate of Appealability to 06/27/2019 at 05:00 pm filed by Appellant Marcelo Augusto Alves. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8763248-1] [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:15 AM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file motion for COA filed by Appellant Marcelo Augusto Alves is GRANTED. [ # 8763248-2 ] COA due on 06/27/2019. AJ [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Marcelo Augusto Alves. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8766490-1] [Entered: 05/07/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Marcelo Augusto Alves. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file a Motion for Certificate of Appealability to 06/27/2019 at 05:00 pm filed by Appellant Marcelo Augusto Alves. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8763248-1] [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Marcelo Augusto Alves. [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Marcelo Augusto Alves. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Rebecca Rock McGuigan for Appellees Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11165] (ECF: Rebecca McGuigan) [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rebecca Rock McGuigan for Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections. [19-11165] (ECF: Rebecca McGuigan) [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant Marcelo Augusto Alves was filed on 01/09/2019. Docket Entry 26. [Entered: 04/01/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Marcelo Augusto Alves on 03/28/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.