This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2019 at 06:04:46 (UTC).

Marc Muri v. National Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Marc Muri filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against National Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2408

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

National Indemnity Company

Plaintiff / Appellant

Marc J. Muri, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Eric G. Serron

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Tara A. Stingley

Attorney at CLINE & WILLIAMS

Suite 200 Sterling Ridge, 12910 Pierce Street

Omaha, NE 68144-1105

Andrew Sloniewsky

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Paul J. Ondrasik Jr.

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Shawn D. Renner

Attorney at CLINE & WILLIAMS

1900 U.S. Bank Building, 233 S. 13Th Street

Lincoln, NE 68508-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Brian K. Matise

Attorney at BURG & SIMPSON

40 Iverness Drive, E.

Englewood, CO 80112-2866

James Ostaszewski

Attorney at ZAMANSKY, LLC

32Nd Floor, 50 Broadway

New York, NY 10004

Jacob H. Zamansky

Attorney at ZAMANSKY, LLC

32Nd Floor, 50 Broadway

New York, NY 10004

Edward H. Glenn

Attorney at ZAMANSKY, LLC

32Nd Floor, 50 Broadway

New York, NY 10004

Justin Sauerwald

Attorney at ZAMANSKY, LLC

32Nd Floor, 50 Broadway

New York, NY 10004

Samuel E. Bonderoff

Attorney at ZAMANSKY, LLC

32Nd Floor, 50 Broadway

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED. [4809492] [19-2408] (YML) [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:22 PM]

Open Document

JUDGMENT FILED - Granting [ # 4809432-2 ] motion to dismiss case filed by Appellant Mr. Marc J. Muri., The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith. [4809487] [19-2408] (YML) [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:19 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Appellant Mr. Marc J. Muri w/service 07/18/2019. [4809432] [19-2408] (SEB) [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:08 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee National Indemnity Company. - FOR CAL [4808149] [19-2408] (PJO) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:28 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Shawn D. Renner for Appellee National Indemnity Company w/service 07/15/2019 [4808102] [19-2408] (SDR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:22 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Tara A. Stingley for Appellee National Indemnity Company w/service 07/15/2019 [4808099] [19-2408] (TAS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:17 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Marc J. Muri - Separate Appendix - w/service 07/15/2019 [4807945] [19-2408] (SEB) [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:49 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Eric G. Serron for Appellee National Indemnity Company w/service 07/11/2019 [4807159] [19-2408] (EGS) [Entered: 07/11/2019 12:34 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Paul J. Ondrasik, Jr. for Appellee National Indemnity Company w/service 07/11/2019 [4807155] [19-2408] (PJO) [Entered: 07/11/2019 12:28 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Samuel E. Bonderoff for Appellant Mr. Marc J. Muri w/service 07/09/2019 [4805903] [19-2408] (SEB) [Entered: 07/09/2019 09:41 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/12/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Marc J. Muri due 08/12/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4804551] [19-2408] (CMH) [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:56 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Judgment both dated 6/18/2019. [4804547] [19-2408] (CMH) [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:54 AM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4804538] [19-2408] (CMH) [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:50 AM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE ISSUED. [4809492] [19-2408] (YML) [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED - Granting [ # 4809432-2 ] motion to dismiss case filed by Appellant Mr. Marc J. Muri., The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith. [4809487] [19-2408] (YML) [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Appellant Mr. Marc J. Muri w/service 07/18/2019. [4809432] [19-2408] (SEB) [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee National Indemnity Company. - FOR CAL [4808149] [19-2408] (PJO) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Shawn D. Renner for Appellee National Indemnity Company w/service 07/15/2019 [4808102] [19-2408] (SDR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Tara A. Stingley for Appellee National Indemnity Company w/service 07/15/2019 [4808099] [19-2408] (TAS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Marc J. Muri - Separate Appendix - w/service 07/15/2019 [4807945] [19-2408] (SEB) [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Eric G. Serron for Appellee National Indemnity Company w/service 07/11/2019 [4807159] [19-2408] (EGS) [Entered: 07/11/2019 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Paul J. Ondrasik, Jr. for Appellee National Indemnity Company w/service 07/11/2019 [4807155] [19-2408] (PJO) [Entered: 07/11/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Samuel E. Bonderoff for Appellant Mr. Marc J. Muri w/service 07/09/2019 [4805903] [19-2408] (SEB) [Entered: 07/09/2019 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/12/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Marc J. Muri due 08/12/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4804551] [19-2408] (CMH) [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Judgment both dated 6/18/2019. [4804547] [19-2408] (CMH) [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4804538] [19-2408] (CMH) [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less