This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/06/2022 at 06:04:49 (UTC).

Manuel Roman, et al v. Prince Telecom LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 Manuel Roman filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Prince Telecom LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1348

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

MANUEL ROMAN

JIQUELLE KINNARD

ANTHONY HAYWARD

Defendant / Appellant

PRINCE TELECOM LLC

Defendant / Appellees

COMCAST CORP

COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michelle Lim Esq.

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Shanon J. Carson Esq.

Attorney at Berger Montague

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Ori Edelstein Esq.

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Carolyn Hunt Cottrell Esq.

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Michelle S. Lim Esq.

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Camille F. Rodriguez Esq.

Attorney at Berger Montague

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Daniel F. Thornton Esq.

Attorney at Berger Montague

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Lane L. Vines Esq.

Attorney at Berger Montague

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Christian A. Angotti Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, Eqt Plaza, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Christopher Michalski Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, Eqt Plaza, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Sarah J. Miley Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, Eqt Plaza, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Robert W. Pritchard Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, Eqt Plaza, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael J. Puma Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Emily C. Reineberg Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lane L. Vines on behalf of Appellee(s) Manuel Roman, Jiquelle Kinnard, and Anthony Hayward. [22-1348] (LLV) [Entered: 03/22/2022 03:41 PM]

#19

(#19) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC and Comcast Corp. [22-1348] (MJP) [Entered: 03/22/2022 01:42 PM]

#18

(#18) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael J. Puma, Esq. for Comcast Corp and Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC requesting the following document(s): Disclosure Statement on or before 04/05/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 03/22/2022 09:20 AM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Prince Telecom LLC. [22-1348] (RWP) [Entered: 03/21/2022 01:10 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Prince Telecom LLC. [22-1348] (RWP) [Entered: 03/21/2022 01:07 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Shanon J. Carson on behalf of Appellee(s) Manuel Roman, Jiquelle Kinnard, and Anthony Hayward. [22-1348] (SJC) [Entered: 03/18/2022 06:02 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Camille Fundora Rodriguez on behalf of Appellee(s) Manuel Roman, Jiquelle Kinnard, and Anthony Hayward. [22-1348] (CF) [Entered: 03/18/2022 05:57 PM]

#24

(#24) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Prince Telecom LLC in 22-1348, Appellants Comcast Corp and Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC in 22-1349. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2022 by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect all party filers] [22-1348, 22-1349]--[Edited 05/05/2022 by EMA] (RWP) [Entered: 05/02/2022 05:06 PM]

#23

(#23) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Prince Telecom LLC in 22-1348, Appellants Comcast Corp and Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC in 22-1349. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2022 by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect all party filers] [22-1348, 22-1349]--[Edited 05/05/2022 by EMA] (RWP) [Entered: 05/02/2022 05:04 PM]

#22

(#22) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC CONSOLIDATED BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Prince Telecom LLC in 22-1348, Appellants Comcast Corp and Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC in 22-1349. Certificate of Service dated 05/02/2022 by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect all party filers] [22-1348, 22-1349]--[Edited 05/05/2022 by EMA] (RWP) [Entered: 05/02/2022 05:00 PM]

21 #2

Briefing Notice Issued

21 #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

#9

(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. Puma on behalf of Appellant(s) Comcast Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. [22-1349, 22-1348] (MJP) [Entered: 03/21/2022 06:49 PM]

#3

(#3) CLERK ORDER The appeals are consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, Appellees brief, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. Appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. [Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order] [22-1348, 22-1349] (LMR) [Entered: 03/07/2022 03:14 PM]

1 #4

ORDER

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Case Caption

#1

Case Opening Letter

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#26) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Prince Telecom LLC in 22-1348, Appellants Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC and Comcast Corp in 22-1349 - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 3 (Volume I attached to Brief). [22-1348, 22-1349] (MCW) [Entered: 05/05/2022 05:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#25) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Prince Telecom LLC in 22-1348, Appellants Comcast Corp and Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC in 22-1349 - Consolidated Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 7. [Entry edited to reflect all party filers] [22-1348, 22-1349]--[Edited 05/05/2022 by EMA] (KEL) [Entered: 05/05/2022 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Prince Telecom LLC in 22-1348, Appellants Comcast Corp and Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC in 22-1349. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2022 by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect all party filers] [22-1348, 22-1349]--[Edited 05/05/2022 by EMA] (RWP) [Entered: 05/02/2022 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Prince Telecom LLC in 22-1348, Appellants Comcast Corp and Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC in 22-1349. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2022 by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect all party filers] [22-1348, 22-1349]--[Edited 05/05/2022 by EMA] (RWP) [Entered: 05/02/2022 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC CONSOLIDATED BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Prince Telecom LLC in 22-1348, Appellants Comcast Corp and Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC in 22-1349. Certificate of Service dated 05/02/2022 by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect all party filers] [22-1348, 22-1349]--[Edited 05/05/2022 by EMA] (RWP) [Entered: 05/02/2022 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Prince Telecom LLC, Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC and Comcast Corp due on or before 05/02/2022. Appendix due on or before 05/02/2022. [22-1348, 22-1349] (LMR) [Entered: 03/23/2022 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lane L. Vines on behalf of Appellee(s) Manuel Roman, Jiquelle Kinnard, and Anthony Hayward. [22-1348] (LLV) [Entered: 03/22/2022 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC and Comcast Corp. [22-1348] (MJP) [Entered: 03/22/2022 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael J. Puma, Esq. for Comcast Corp and Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC requesting the following document(s): Disclosure Statement on or before 04/05/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 03/22/2022 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. Puma on behalf of Appellant(s) Comcast Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. [22-1349, 22-1348] (MJP) [Entered: 03/21/2022 06:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert W. Pritchard on behalf of Appellant(s) Prince Telecom, LLC. [22-1348] (RWP) [Entered: 03/21/2022 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Prince Telecom LLC. [22-1348] (RWP) [Entered: 03/21/2022 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Prince Telecom LLC advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [22-1348] (RWP) [Entered: 03/21/2022 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Prince Telecom LLC. [22-1348] (RWP) [Entered: 03/21/2022 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Prince Telecom LLC. [22-1348] (RWP) [Entered: 03/21/2022 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Shanon J. Carson on behalf of Appellee(s) Manuel Roman, Jiquelle Kinnard, and Anthony Hayward. [22-1348] (SJC) [Entered: 03/18/2022 06:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Camille Fundora Rodriguez on behalf of Appellee(s) Manuel Roman, Jiquelle Kinnard, and Anthony Hayward. [22-1348] (CF) [Entered: 03/18/2022 05:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK ORDER The appeals are consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, Appellees brief, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. Appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. [Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order] [22-1348, 22-1349] (LMR) [Entered: 03/07/2022 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 03/07/2022 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Prince Telecom LLC in District Court No. 1-21-cv-00693. (LMR) [Entered: 03/07/2022 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prince Telecom, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Comcast Cable Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMCAST CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily C. Reineberg