This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:30 (UTC).

Manuel Fernandez v. Commissioner of Social Sec.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Manuel Fernandez filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Sec. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12706

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MANUEL FERNANDEZ

Defendant / Appellee

COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes

Attorney at Palacios Disability, PA

14221 Sw 120Th St Ste 228

Miami, FL 33186

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Emily M. Smachetti

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Jill A. Sausser

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

Jillian Nelson

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #4

USDC Order- Doc #25

Open Restricted Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #24

Open Restricted Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Restricted Document #1

DKT-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes for Appellant Manuel Fernandez. Appellants brief due on 09/17/2019 as to Appellant Manuel Fernandez. Appendix due on 09/24/2019 as to Appellant Manuel Fernandez. [Entered: 08/30/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jillian Nelson for Appellee Commissioner of Social Security. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12706] (ECF: Jillian Nelson) [Entered: 08/07/2019 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jill Sausser for Commissioner of Social Security [19-12706] (ECF: Jill Sausser) [Entered: 08/05/2019 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes for Appellant Manuel Fernandez. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12706] (ECF: Katherine Palacios-Paredes) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes for Appellant Manuel Fernandez. [19-12706] (ECF: Katherine Palacios-Paredes) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes for Manuel Fernandez. [19-12706] (ECF: Katherine Palacios-Paredes) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Manuel Fernandez. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/03/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Manuel Fernandez was filed on 07/23/2019. Docket Entry 30. [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jillian Nelson for SSA [19-12706] (ECF: Jillian Nelson) [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Manuel Fernandez was filed on 07/12/2019. Docket Entry 28. [Entered: 07/19/2019 07:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Manuel Fernandez on 07/12/2019. Fee Status: IFP Pending. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/29/2019 as to Appellant Manuel Fernandez. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/12/2019 as to Appellee Commissioner of Social Security [Entered: 07/19/2019 07:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less