Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2021 at 06:28:50 (UTC).

Manderville v. Saul

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Manderville filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-62

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff / Appellant

Irving Manderville

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Steven David Clymer

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York

P.O. Box 7198, 100 South Clinton Street

Syracuse, NY 13261

Sixtina Fernandez

Attorney at United States Social Security Administration

26 Federal Plaza

New York, NY 10278

Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York

445 Broadway

Albany, NY 12207

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Peter A. Gorton Esq.

Attorney at Lachman & Gorton

1500 East Main Street, P.O. Box 89

Endicott, NY 13761

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Irving Manderville Brief due date as 04/22/2021 FILED.[3044854] [21-62] [Entered: 02/25/2021 09:41 PM]

#26

RESTRICTED

#23

RESTRICTED

#22

RESTRICTED

#21

RESTRICTED

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

8 #7

Supporting Document

8 #6

Supporting Document

8 #5

Supporting Document

8 #4

Supporting Document

8 #3

Supporting Document

8 #2

Supporting Document

8 #1

Form C FILED

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Irving Manderville Brief due date as 04/22/2021 FILED.[3044854] [21-62] [Entered: 02/25/2021 09:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[3041515] [21-62] [Entered: 02/22/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/23/2021, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3021923] [21-62] [Entered: 01/27/2021 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/24/2021, Start Time: 1:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3021722] [21-62] [Entered: 01/27/2021 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) (PLEASE DISREGARD: ENTERED IN ERROR) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/24/2021, Start Time: 1:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3021705] [21-62] [Entered: 01/27/2021 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ATTORNEY, Karen Folster Lesperance for Andrew Saul, in case 21-62, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[3020681] [21-62] [Entered: 01/26/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY, Sixtina Fernandez, [ # 16 ], in place of attorney Karen Folster Lesperance, SUBSTITUTED.[3020678] [21-62] [Entered: 01/26/2021 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Saul, FILED. Service date 01/25/2021 by CM/ECF. [3020388] [21-62] [Entered: 01/25/2021 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Saul, FILED. Service date 01/25/2021 by CM/ECF. [3020352] [21-62] [Entered: 01/25/2021 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY, Karen Folster Lesperance, [ # 14 ], in place of attorney Steven D. Clymer, SUBSTITUTED.[3020341] [21-62] [Entered: 01/25/2021 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Saul, FILED. Service date 01/25/2021 by CM/ECF. [3020251] [21-62] [Entered: 01/25/2021 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/12/2021, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3019152] [21-62] [Entered: 01/22/2021 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Irving Manderville, informing Court of proposed due date 04/22/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 01/22/2021 by CM/ECF.[3018755] [21-62] [Entered: 01/22/2021 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Irving Manderville, FILED. Service date 01/22/2021 by CM/ECF.[3018754] [21-62] [Entered: 01/22/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Irving Manderville, FILED. Service date 01/22/2021 by CM/ECF.[3018752] [21-62] [Entered: 01/22/2021 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Irving Manderville, FILED. Service date 01/22/2021 by CM/ECF.[3018746] [21-62] [Entered: 01/22/2021 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/17/2020, RECEIVED.[3011996] [21-62] [Entered: 01/12/2021 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/17/2020, RECEIVED.[3011995] [21-62] [Entered: 01/12/2021 05:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Irving Manderville, FILED. [3011994] [21-62] [Entered: 01/12/2021 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter A. Gorton