This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/05/2021 at 21:37:40 (UTC).

Managed Care Advisory Group, L v. CIGNA Healthcare, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Managed Care Advisory Group, L filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against CIGNA Healthcare, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10247

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

CIGNA HEALTHCARE, INC.

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Plaintiff / Appellee

MANAGED CARE ADVISORY GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Frank A. Zacherl III

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4100

Miami, FL 33431

Chester T. Kamin

Attorney at Jenner & Block, LLP

353 N Clark St

Chicago, IL 60654

Edward Robert McCarthy

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP

1395 Brickell Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33131

H. Blair Hahn

Attorney at Rogers Patrick Westbrook & Brickman, LLC

1037 Chuck Dawley Blvd Bldg A, Po Box 1007

Mt Pleasant, SC 29464

Jonathan L. Alpert

Attorney at The Alpert Law Firm

17102 Heart Of Palms Dr

Tampa, FL 33647-3509

Rodney K. Castille

Attorney at Reich & Binstock, LLP

4625 San Felipe St Ste 1000

Houston, TX 77027-3307

Craig A. Hoover

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US, LLP

555 13Th St Nw Ste 7W-302

Washington, DC 20004

T. English McCutchen

Attorney at McCutchen Blanton Johnson & Barnette

1414 Lady St

Columbia, SC 29201

Christopher MacNeil Murphy

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery, LLP

444 W Lake St Ste 4000

Chicago, IL 60606

Julie E. Nevins

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3100

Miami, FL 33131

Jamie Scott Platto

Attorney at Epstein Becker & Green, PC

1 California St Fl 26

San Francisco, CA 94111-5427

Aaron S. Podhurst

Attorney at Podhurst Orseck, PA

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33130

David Henry Pollack

Attorney at Law Office of David H Pollack, LLC

2600 S Douglas Rd Ste 1007

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Harold Stephen Rash

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 2800

Miami, FL 33131

Joseph A. Schwartz III

Attorney at Schwartz & Metz

10 W Madison St

Baltimore, MD 21201

Christopher A. Seeger

Attorney at Seeger Weiss, LLP

77 Water St Fl 8

New York, NY 10005

Kathleen Taylor Sooy

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Ave Nw Fl 11

Washington, DC 20004

Anita F. Stork

Attorney at Cooley, LLP

3 Embarcadero Ctr Fl 20

San Francisco, CA 94111-4004

John J. Swenson

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Ave Ste 4600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Janice Weiss

Attorney at Gray & Weiss

500 W Jefferson Citizen Plaza Ste 1400

Louisville, KY 40202

216 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Reply Brief filed by Appellant CI. [21-10247] (ECF: Martin Steinberg) [Entered: 07/23/2021 03:46 PM]

Open Document #9

Appellee Supplemental Appendix Volume 9 of 9

Open Document #8

Appellee Supplemental Appendix Volume 8 of 9

Open Document #7

Appellee Supplemental Appendix Volume 7 of 9

Open Document #6

Appellee Supplemental Appendix Volume 6 of 9

Open Document #4

Appellee Supplemental Appendix Volume 4 of 9

Open Document #3

Appellee Supplemental Appendix Volume 3 of 9

Open Document #2

Appellee Supplemental Appendix Volume 2 of 9

Open Document #1

Appellee Supplemental Appendix Volume 1 of 9

Open Document #2

JQ Issued

Open Document #1

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

DC Paperless Order DE# 6778

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply Brief filed by Appellant CI. [21-10247] (ECF: Martin Steinberg) [Entered: 07/23/2021 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Appendix [9 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. [21-10247] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 07/09/2021 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellee's Brief filed by Appellee Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. [21-10247] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 07/02/2021 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Before the Court are (1) Appellees Motion to File Appellees Redacted Brief and Appendix; and Motion to File Under Seal Appellees Unredacted Brief and Appendix; (2) Appellees Unopposed Motion to File Appellees Redacted Motion to Supplement and to File Under Seal Appellees Unredacted Motion to Supplement; (3) Appellees Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal; (4) CIGNAs Motion to Seal Reply Brief; and (5) Appellees Unopposed Motion to File Appellees Redacted Reply Re: Motion to Supplement and to File Under Seal Appellees Unredacted Reply Re: Motion to Supplement.Appellees Motion to File Appellees Redacted Brief and Appendix; and Motion to File Under Seal Appellees Unredacted Brief and Appendix is GRANTED. Appellees Unopposed Motion to File Appellees Redacted Motion to Supplement and to File Under Seal Appellees Unredacted Motion to Supplement is GRANTED. Appellees Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal is CARRIED WITH THE CASE. CIGNAs Motion to Seal Reply Brief is GRANTED. Appellees Unopposed Motion to File Appellees Redacted Reply Re: Motion to Supplement and to File Under Seal Appellees Unredacted Reply Re: Motion to Supplement is GRANTED. [ # 9444755-2 ] [ # 9443634-2 ] [ # 9432012-2 ] [ # 9426336-2 ] [ # 9432034-2 ] AJ [Entered: 08/30/2021 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDeficiency notice sent to Jeffrey W. Gutchess for Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. The unredacted reply in support of the motion to supplement the record has not been filed. Please file as soon as possible. [Entered: 08/16/2021 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketReceived REDACTED paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant CI. [Entered: 07/27/2021 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to response filed by Appellee Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. [21-10247] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 07/26/2021 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to seal filed by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. Motion is Unopposed. [9444755-1] [21-10247] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 07/26/2021 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to seal filed by CI. Motion is Unopposed. [9443634-1] [21-10247] (ECF: Martin Steinberg) [Entered: 07/23/2021 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE to Motion to supplement the record filed by Appellee Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC [ # 9432034-2 ] filed by Attorney Martin Steinberg for Appellant CI and Attorney Martin Steinberg for Appellant CI. [21-10247] (ECF: Martin Steinberg) [Entered: 07/19/2021 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Martin Steinberg for Appellant CI. [21-10247] (ECF: Martin Steinberg) [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Appellants Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof is DENIED. Appellant has not made the requisite showing. See Nken v. Holder, 556 U.S. 418, 434 (2009). The Clerk of Court is directed to treat any motion for reconsideration of this order as a non-emergency matter. [ # 9294151-2 ] AJ, RSR and JP [Entered: 01/29/2021 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant CI [ # 9294151-2 ] filed by Attorney Jeffrey W. Gutchess for Appellee Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. [21-10247] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 01/28/2021 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9295278-1] [21-10247] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 01/28/2021 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to CI. [Entered: 01/28/2021 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION to stay pending appeal filed by CI. Motion is Opposed. [9294151-1] [21-10247] (ECF: Martin Steinberg) [Entered: 01/27/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jeff W. Gutchess Attorney Jeffrey W. Gutchess for Appellee Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10247] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 01/27/2021 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Martin Steinberg for CI. [21-10247] (ECF: Martin Steinberg) [Entered: 01/27/2021 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeff W. Gutchess Jeffrey W. Gutchess for Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. [21-10247] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant CIGNA Healthcare, Inc. on 01/21/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/03/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/05/2021 as to Appellant CIGNA Healthcare, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/19/2021 as to Appellee Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC [Entered: 01/27/2021 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cigna HealthCare of Texas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie E. Nevins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Henry Pollack