This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 06:40:07 (UTC).

Malinski, et al v. BNSF Railway Company

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Malinski filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BNSF Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5001

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiff

PAULA SMITH

Counter Defendant

TYLER D. MALINSKI

Counter Claimant

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

William R. Robb

Attorney at Aleshire Robb & Rapp

2847 South Ingram Mill Road, Suite A102

Springfield, MO 65804

Kevin J. Rapp

Attorney at Aleshire Robb & Rapp

2847 South Ingram Mill Road, Suite A102

Springfield, MO 65804

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Robert Allen Rush Esq.

Attorney at Logan & Lowry

P.O. Box 558, 101 South Wilson Street

Vinita, OK 74301-0558

Thomas J. McGeady

Attorney at Logan & Lowry

P.O. Box 558, 101 South Wilson Street

Vinita, OK 74301-0558

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Matthew Branton Covert

Attorney at Mullican & Hart

15 East 5Th Street, Suite 2200

Tulsa, OK 74103

Christopher D. Wolek

Attorney at Mullican & Hart

15 East 5Th Street, Suite 2200

Tulsa, OK 74103

George R. Mullican

Attorney at Mullican & Hart

15 East 5Th Street, Suite 2200

Tulsa, OK 74103

Caitlyn Hubbard

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman

201 Main Street, Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102-0000

Robert D. Hart

Attorney at Mullican & Hart

15 East 5Th Street, Suite 2200

Tulsa, OK 74103

Jody S. Sanders

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman

201 Main Street, Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102-0000

Marianne Auld

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman

201 Main Street, Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102-0000

Michael Womack

Attorney at Mullican & Hart

15 East 5Th Street, Suite 2200

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10630704] Motion filed by Appellants Tyler D. Malinski and Paula Smith to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 03/15/2019. Served on: 03/04/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-5001] KJR [Entered: 03/04/2019 11:27 AM]

Open Document

[10621474] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/24/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 03/05/2019 for Tyler D. Malinski and Paula Smith. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:48 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10620843] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 02/22/2019 for William R. Robb. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/23/2019 08:58 AM]

Open Document

[10620841] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 02/22/2019 for Kevin J. Rapp. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/23/2019 08:55 AM]

Open Document

[10620226] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Thomas J. McGeady for Tyler D. Malinski. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:06 PM]

Open Document

[10620187] Entry of appearance filed by Kevin J. Rapp and William R. Robb for Paula Smith. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (no certificate attached). Served on 01/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:07 PM]

Open Document

[10620185] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Tyler D. Malinski. Transcript ordered: Served on: 01/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001] TJM [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:00 PM]

Open Document

[10620183] Docketing statement filed by Tyler D. Malinski and Paula Smith. Served on 01/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001] TJM [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:00 PM]

Open Document

[10619340] Entry of appearance filed by Matthew Branton Covert, Mr. Robert D. Hart, Mr. George R. Mullican, Mr. Christopher D. Wolek and Mr. Michael Womack for BNSF Railway Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (the parties listed are attorneys in the appeal). Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:11 PM]

Open Document

[10619007] Entry of appearance filed by Caitlyn Hubbard, Jody S Sanders and Marianne Auld for BNSF Railway Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (All previously disclosed.). Served on 01/15/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5001] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:35 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Transmittal letter and preliminary record

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • [10630711] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellants' unopposed motion to extend time (10 days) to file Appellants' opening brief and appendix to 03/15/2019 for Tyler D. Malinski and Paula Smith. Counsel is cautioned that future motions not in compliance with 10th Cir. R. 27.6(B) may be denied. Please note that all documents filed with this court shall be in searchable PDF format. Served on 03/04/2019. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-5001] [Entered: 03/04/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10630704] Motion filed by Appellants Tyler D. Malinski and Paula Smith to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 03/15/2019. Served on: 03/04/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-5001] KJR [Entered: 03/04/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • [10627399] Attorney Mr. William R. Robb for Paula Smith admitted to the bar of this court. [19-5001] [Entered: 02/19/2019 08:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • [10627108] Attorney Mr. Kevin J. Rapp for Paula Smith admitted to the bar of this court. [19-5001] [Entered: 02/15/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10621474] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/24/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 03/05/2019 for Tyler D. Malinski and Paula Smith. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10620906] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 02/01/2019 at 2:00 pm (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-5001] [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10620843] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 02/22/2019 for William R. Robb. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/23/2019 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10620841] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 02/22/2019 for Kevin J. Rapp. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/23/2019 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10620226] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Thomas J. McGeady for Tyler D. Malinski. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • [10620201] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 01/25/2019 for Mark C. McCartt, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-5001] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10620187] Entry of appearance filed by Kevin J. Rapp and William R. Robb for Paula Smith. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (no certificate attached). Served on 01/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10620185] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Tyler D. Malinski. Transcript ordered: Served on: 01/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001] TJM [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10620183] Docketing statement filed by Tyler D. Malinski and Paula Smith. Served on 01/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001] TJM [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • [10620180] Entry of appearance submitted by Kevin J. Rapp for Appellant Paula Smith for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001] --[Edited 01/18/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] TJM [Entered: 01/18/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • [10620179] Entry of appearance submitted by Thomas J. McGeady for Appellant Tyler D. Malinski for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001]--[Edited 01/18/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] TJM [Entered: 01/18/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10619340] Entry of appearance filed by Matthew Branton Covert, Mr. Robert D. Hart, Mr. George R. Mullican, Mr. Christopher D. Wolek and Mr. Michael Womack for BNSF Railway Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (the parties listed are attorneys in the appeal). Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • [10619320] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher D. Wolek, George R. Mullican, Robert D. Hart, Michael P. Womack, Matthew B. Covert for Appellee BNSF Railway Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001]--[Edited 01/16/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] CDW [Entered: 01/16/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10619007] Entry of appearance filed by Caitlyn Hubbard, Jody S Sanders and Marianne Auld for BNSF Railway Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (All previously disclosed.). Served on 01/15/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5001] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • [10619001] Entry of appearance submitted by Marianne M. Auld, Jody S. Sanders, Caitlyn E. Hubbard for Appellee BNSF Railway Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5001]--[Edited 01/15/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/15/19] MA [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10616167] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/04/2019 Docketing statement due 01/18/2019 for Tyler D. Malinski and Paula Smith. Transcript order form due 01/18/2019 for Tyler D. Malinski and Paula Smith. Notice of appearance due on 01/18/2019 for BNSF Railway Company, Tyler D. Malinski and Paula Smith. [19-5001] [Entered: 01/04/2019 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BNSF Railway Company is a litigant