This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/10/2022 at 06:08:09 (UTC).

Malik v. DHS

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 Malik filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DHS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10772

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Adam A. Malik

Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C.

Defendant / Appellees

United States Department of Homeland Security

U.S. Customs & Border Protection

Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Chris Magnus, Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Roy Kevin Petty

Attorney at Roy Petty & Associates, P.L.L.C.

8700 N. Stemmons Freeway

Dallas, TX 75247

Barri Martinez

Attorney at Roy Petty & Associates, P.L.L.C.

8700 N. Stemmons Freeway

Dallas, TX 75247

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Brian Walters Stoltz

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1100 Commerce Street

Dallas, TX 75242-1699

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Adam A. Malik and Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. [22-10772] (AS) [Entered: 08/11/2022 04:31 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9915753-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-10772] (MFY) [Entered: 08/15/2022 11:21 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Roy Kevin Petty for Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. and Mr. Adam A. Malik for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10772] (Roy Kevin Petty ) [Entered: 08/23/2022 03:30 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Brian Walters Stoltz for Chris Magnus, Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs & Border Protection and DHS for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10772] (Brian Walters Stoltz ) [Entered: 08/25/2022 02:59 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Adam A. Malik and Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [22-10772] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. and Mr. Adam A. Malik advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/26/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Petty; Attorney for Appellee: Stoltz [22-10772] (Roy Kevin Petty ) [Entered: 08/26/2022 02:23 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/11/2022 for Appellants Adam A. Malik and Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C.. [22-10772] (CMB) [Entered: 08/30/2022 03:06 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10772] (Barri Martinez ) [Entered: 08/30/2022 05:20 PM]

Open Document

JOINT MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Adam A. Malik and Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. and Appellees DHS, Chris Magnus, Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs & Border Protection to view and obtain sealed document. [22-10772] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees DHS, Chris Magnus, Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs & Border Protection to view and obtain sealed document. Date of service: 09/01/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Martinez, Petty; Attorney for Appellee: Stoltz [22-10772] (Brian Walters Stoltz ) [Entered: 09/01/2022 03:11 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. and Mr. Adam A. Malik for filing Appellants' Brief until 11/10/2022 [22-10772] (Roy Kevin Petty ) [Entered: 09/01/2022 05:35 PM]

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #2

Court Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER granting Motion to view and obtain sealed document filed by Appellees DHS, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chris Magnus, Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection and Appellants Mr. Adam A. Malik and Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. [ # 9930748-2 ] [22-10772] (MFY) [Entered: 09/07/2022 11:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Adam A. Malik and Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C.. Extension Granted to and including 11/10/2022. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 11/10/2022 for Appellants Adam A. Malik and Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. [22-10772] (MFY) [Entered: 09/02/2022 09:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. and Mr. Adam A. Malik for filing Appellants' Brief until 11/10/2022 [22-10772] (Roy Kevin Petty ) [Entered: 09/01/2022 05:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Adam A. Malik and Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. and Appellees DHS, Chris Magnus, Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs & Border Protection to view and obtain sealed document. [22-10772] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees DHS, Chris Magnus, Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs & Border Protection to view and obtain sealed document. Date of service: 09/01/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Martinez, Petty; Attorney for Appellee: Stoltz [22-10772] (Brian Walters Stoltz ) [Entered: 09/01/2022 03:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Barri Martinez for party(s) Appellant Adam A. Malik Appellant Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C., in case 22-10772 [22-10772] (MFY) [Entered: 08/31/2022 11:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10772] (Barri Martinez ) [Entered: 08/30/2022 05:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/11/2022 for Appellants Adam A. Malik and Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C.. [22-10772] (CMB) [Entered: 08/30/2022 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-10772] (CMB) [Entered: 08/30/2022 03:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Adam A. Malik and Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [22-10772] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. and Mr. Adam A. Malik advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/26/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Petty; Attorney for Appellee: Stoltz [22-10772] (Roy Kevin Petty ) [Entered: 08/26/2022 02:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Brian Walters Stoltz for Appellee Chris Magnus, Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection in 22-10772, Attorney Brian Walters Stoltz for Appellee Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security in 22-10772, Attorney Brian Walters Stoltz for Appellee U.S. Customs & Border Protection in 22-10772, Attorney Brian Walters Stoltz for Appellee DHS in 22-10772 [22-10772] (MFY) [Entered: 08/26/2022 11:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Roy Kevin Petty for Appellant Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. in 22-10772, Attorney Roy Kevin Petty for Appellant Adam A. Malik in 22-10772 [22-10772] (MFY) [Entered: 08/25/2022 03:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Brian Walters Stoltz for Chris Magnus, Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Mr. Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs & Border Protection and DHS for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10772] (Brian Walters Stoltz ) [Entered: 08/25/2022 02:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Roy Kevin Petty for Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. and Mr. Adam A. Malik for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10772] (Roy Kevin Petty ) [Entered: 08/23/2022 03:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:21-CV-88. Electronic ROA due on 08/30/2022. [22-10772] (MFY) [Entered: 08/15/2022 11:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9915753-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-10772] (MFY) [Entered: 08/15/2022 11:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Adam A. Malik and Malik & Associates, P.L.L.C. [22-10772] (AS) [Entered: 08/11/2022 04:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Customs and Border Protection is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Walters Stoltz(Designation Retained)