This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/29/2020 at 06:02:29 (UTC).

Maldonado-Cabrera, et al v. Anglero-Alfaro, et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Maldonado-Cabrera filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Anglero-Alfaro. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2030

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

 

Party Details

Defendants

SIMED

PUERTO RICO MEDICAL DEFENSE INSURANCE CO.

REY PAGAN-RIVERA

Plaintiff / Appellants

ANNELYS MALDONADO-CABRERA

MARIA DOLORES MALDONADO-CABRERA

Defendant / Appellees

DR. BRYAN SANTIAGO-DIAZ

DR. JORGE ANGLERO-ALFARO

DR. EDGARDO BERMUDEZ-MORENO

HOSPITAL EPISCOPAL SAN LUCAS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Anselmo Irizarry-Irizarry

Attorney at Matta & Matta PSC

P. O. Box 335060

Ponce, PR 00733-5060

Jose Hector Vivas

Attorney at Vivas & Vivas

P.O. Box 330951

Ponce, PR 00733-0951

Juan Carlos Ramirez-Ortiz

Attorney at PR Department of Justice

Po Box 9020192

San Juan, PR 00902-0192

Pablo Tufino-Soto

Attorney at PR Department of Justice

Po Box 9020192

San Juan, PR 00902-0192

Carlos Lugo-Fiol

Po Box 260150

San Juan, PR 00926

Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas

Attorney at RC Law & Litigation Services PSC

33 Resolution St., Doral Bank Plaza Ste 801

San Juan, PR 00920-5604

Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez

Attorney at Landron & Vera LLP

1606 Ave Ponce De Leon, Ste 501

San Juan, PR 00909

Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz

Attorney at Landron & Vera LLP

1606 Ave Ponce De Leon, Ste 501

San Juan, PR 00909

Eileen Landron-Guardiola

Attorney at Landron & Vera LLP

1606 Ave Ponce De Leon, Ste 501

San Juan, PR 00909

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michelle Annet Ramos-Jimenez

Attorney at Luis Rafael Rivera Law Office

Capital Center Bldg, 239 Arterial Hostos Ave, Ste 401

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Electronic Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Open Document

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Annelys Maldonado-Cabrera and Maria Dolores Maldonado-Cabrera. Certificate of service dated 12/27/2020. [20-2030] (MAR) [Entered: 12/27/2020 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Bryan Santiago-Diaz filed by Attorney Carlos Lugo-Fiol. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2020. [20-2030] (CL) [Entered: 12/14/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 12/28/2020 for appellant Annelys Maldonado-Cabrera and Maria Dolores Maldonado-Cabrera. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-2030] (AL) [Entered: 11/18/2020 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Annelys Maldonado-Cabrera and Maria Dolores Maldonado-Cabrera indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 11/16/2020. [20-2030] (MAR) [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Annelys Maldonado-Cabrera and Maria Dolores Maldonado-Cabrera. Certificate of service dated 11/16/2020. [20-2030] (MAR) [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Annelys Maldonado-Cabrera and Maria Dolores Maldonado-Cabrera filed by Attorney Michelle A. Ramos-Jimenez. Certificate of service dated 11/16/2020. [20-2030] (MAR) [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #86) filed by Appellants Annelys Maldonado-Cabrera and Maria Dolores Maldonado-Cabrera. Docketing Statement due 11/16/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 11/16/2020. Appearance form due 11/16/2020. [20-2030] (AL) [Entered: 11/02/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOSPITAL EPISCOPAL SAN LUCAS II is a litigant

Latest cases where Puerto Rico Medical Defense is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anselmo Irizarry-Irizarry