This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2019 at 05:13:17 (UTC).

Maestro Faison v. Chief Judge of the Eleventh, et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Maestro Faison against Chief Judge of the Eleventh in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-14192

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CHIEF JUDGE OF THE ELEVENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

STATE ATTORNEY, Katherine Fernandez, Daniel Voredo, John Meyers

FLORIDA PROBATION AND PAROLE COMMISSION, Marcia Hendry

Plaintiff / Appellant

MAESTRO MATTHEW FAISON

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

usdc order 21

Open Document #1

PLRA Prisoner Case Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Maestro Matthew Faison has failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules. [Entered: 11/20/2019 01:07 PM]

Open Document #3

DKT-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Maestro Matthew Faison has failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules. [Entered: 11/20/2019 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Maestro Matthew Faison on 10/22/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.