This case was last updated from PACER on 06/26/2021 at 06:02:59 (UTC).

Madison Lara, et al v. Commissioner PA State Police

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Madison Lara filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Commissioner PA State Police. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1832

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION INC

LOGAN D. MILLER

MADISON M. LARA

FIREARMS POLICY COALITION INC

SOPHIA KNEPLEY

Defendant / Appellee

COMMISSIONER PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Peter A. Patterson Esq.

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Adam Kraunt Esq.

Attorney at Firearms Policy Coalition

1215 K Street, 17Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Joshua Prince Esq.

Attorney at Prince Law Offices

646 Lenape Road

Bechtelsville, PA 19505

Haley N. Proctor Esq.

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

John D. Ohlendorf Esq.

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

David H. Thompson Esq.

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott A. Bradley Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Sarah J. Simkin Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Daniel B. Mullen Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Joint Appendix - Vol. II

15 #1

Joint Appendix - Vol. I

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of Appellants Firearms Policy Coalition Inc, Sophia Knepley, Madison M. Lara, Logan D. Miller and Second Amendment Foundation Inc. Certificate of Service dated 06/23/2021 by ECF. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 06/23/2021 03:38 PM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John D. Ohlendorf on behalf of Appellant(s) Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. [21-1832] (JDO) [Entered: 06/23/2021 10:00 AM]

12 #2

Briefing Notice Issued

12 #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation Inc and Firearms Policy Coalition Inc. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 05/11/2021 03:49 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Peter A. Patterson on behalf of Appellant(s) Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation, and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. [21-1832] (PAP) [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:34 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation Inc and Firearms Policy Coalition Inc advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:22 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation Inc and Firearms Policy Coalition Inc. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:17 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Firearms Policy Coalition Inc. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:13 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Second Amendment Foundation Inc. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:10 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David H. Thompson on behalf of Appellant(s) Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation, and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:00 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joshua Prince, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation, and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. [21-1832] (JP) [Entered: 05/07/2021 10:05 AM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Mullen on behalf of Appellee(s) Commissioner Pennsylvania State Police. [21-1832] (DBM) [Entered: 05/04/2021 08:24 AM]

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #2

District Court Memorandum

#1

Notice of Appeal

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Firearms Policy Coalition Inc, Sophia Knepley, Madison M. Lara, Logan D. Miller and Second Amendment Foundation Inc. Certificate of service dated 06/23/2021 by ECF. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 06/23/2021 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of Appellants Firearms Policy Coalition Inc, Sophia Knepley, Madison M. Lara, Logan D. Miller and Second Amendment Foundation Inc. Certificate of Service dated 06/23/2021 by ECF. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 06/23/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John D. Ohlendorf on behalf of Appellant(s) Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. [21-1832] (JDO) [Entered: 06/23/2021 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Firearms Policy Coalition Inc, Sophia Knepley, Madison M. Lara, Logan D. Miller and Second Amendment Foundation Inc due on or before 06/23/2021. Appendix due on or before 06/23/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 05/14/2021 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation Inc and Firearms Policy Coalition Inc. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 05/11/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Peter A. Patterson on behalf of Appellant(s) Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation, and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. [21-1832] (PAP) [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation Inc and Firearms Policy Coalition Inc advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation Inc and Firearms Policy Coalition Inc. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Firearms Policy Coalition Inc. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Second Amendment Foundation Inc. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David H. Thompson on behalf of Appellant(s) Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation, and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. [21-1832] (DHT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joshua Prince, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Madison M. Lara, Sophia Knepley, Logan D. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation, and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. [21-1832] (JP) [Entered: 05/07/2021 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Mullen on behalf of Appellee(s) Commissioner Pennsylvania State Police. [21-1832] (DBM) [Entered: 05/04/2021 08:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 04/27/2021 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Firearms Policy Coalition Inc, Sophia Knepley, Madison M. Lara, Logan D. Miller and Second Amendment Foundation Inc in District Court No. 2-20-cv-01582. (AMR) [Entered: 04/27/2021 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Second Amendment Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah J. Simkin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel B. Mullen Esq.