This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/29/2022 at 06:18:08 (UTC).

Macon v. BP Expl & Prod

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Macon filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Expl Prod. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-30394

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Willie James Macon

Defendant / Appellees

BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated

BP America Production Company

BP, P.L.C.

Transocean Holdings, L.L.C.

Transocean Deepwater, Incorporated

Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated

Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Paul Allen Dominick

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet, L.L.C.

205 King Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Timothy John Falcon

Attorney at Falcon Law Firm

5044 Lapalco Boulevard

Marrero, LA 70072

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert Beattie McNeal Esq.

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139

George W. Hicks Jr.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Russell Keith Jarrett Esq.

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139

Aaron Lloyd Nielson

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Devin Chase Reid Esq.

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139

Charles B. Wilmore

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139

Kerry J. Miller

Attorney at Fishman Haygood, L.L.P.

201 Saint Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

Robert Alan York

Attorney at Reed Smith, L.L.P.

811 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002-6110

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Willie James Macon [22-30394] (MAS) [Entered: 06/30/2022 05:26 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9885854-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-30394] (MAS) [Entered: 07/06/2022 10:12 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/17/2022 for Appellant Willie James Macon. [22-30394] (CMB) [Entered: 07/08/2022 07:48 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30394] (Russell Keith Jarrett ) [Entered: 07/08/2022 03:51 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30394] (Charles B. Wilmore ) [Entered: 07/08/2022 04:18 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert Beattie McNeal, Esq. for BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30394] (Robert Beattie McNeal ) [Entered: 07/08/2022 04:26 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30394] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 07/08/2022 04:31 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30394] (George W. Hicks Jr.) [Entered: 07/08/2022 04:39 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert Alan York for Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30394] (Robert Alan York ) [Entered: 07/13/2022 11:28 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30394] (Timothy John Falcon ) [Entered: 07/22/2022 03:52 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Willie James Macon for filing Appellant's Brief until 09/16/2022 [22-30394] (Timothy John Falcon ) [Entered: 08/10/2022 03:43 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER to suspend briefing notice dated 07/08/2022 [9917722-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled [22-30394] (MAS) [Entered: 08/17/2022 08:27 AM]

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #2

ROA Desig Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Involvement terminated for Interested Parties Lead Class Counsel and Claims Administrator in 22-30394. Reason: parties were entered in error. [22-30394] (MAS) [Entered: 08/18/2022 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER [9918042-2] Case Management due on 08/31/2022 [22-30394] (MAS) [Entered: 08/17/2022 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Interested Parties Lead Class Counsel and Claims Administrator added to case. Reason: additional instructions received after case opening. [22-30394] (MAS) [Entered: 08/17/2022 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER to suspend briefing notice dated 07/08/2022 [9917722-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled [22-30394] (MAS) [Entered: 08/17/2022 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Willie James Macon. Extension Granted to and including 09/16/2022. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 09/16/2022 for Appellant Willie James Macon. [22-30394] (SEP) [Entered: 08/10/2022 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Willie James Macon for filing Appellant's Brief until 09/16/2022 [22-30394] (Timothy John Falcon ) [Entered: 08/10/2022 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Timothy John Falcon for party(s) Appellant Willie James Macon, in case 22-30394 [22-30394] (CB) [Entered: 07/26/2022 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30394] (Timothy John Falcon ) [Entered: 07/22/2022 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert Alan York for Appellee Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated in 22-30394. [22-30394] (SEP) [Entered: 07/14/2022 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert Alan York for Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30394] (Robert Alan York ) [Entered: 07/13/2022 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30394] (George W. Hicks Jr.) [Entered: 07/08/2022 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30394] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 07/08/2022 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert Beattie McNeal, Esq. for BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30394] (Robert Beattie McNeal ) [Entered: 07/08/2022 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30394] (Charles B. Wilmore ) [Entered: 07/08/2022 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30394] (Russell Keith Jarrett ) [Entered: 07/08/2022 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/17/2022 for Appellant Willie James Macon. [22-30394] (CMB) [Entered: 07/08/2022 07:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-30394] (CMB) [Entered: 07/08/2022 07:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:17-CV-3548. Electronic ROA due on 07/21/2022. [22-30394] (MAS) [Entered: 07/06/2022 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9885854-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-30394] (MAS) [Entered: 07/06/2022 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Willie James Macon [22-30394] (MAS) [Entered: 06/30/2022 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Transocean Deepwater, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant