This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2021 at 05:21:21 (UTC).

M S International, Inc. v. US

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 M S International, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1679

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FOSHAN YIXIN STONE COMPANY, LTD.

ARIZONA TILE LLC

M S INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

CAMBRIA COMPANY LLC

UNITED STATES

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRUSKIN INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Luke A. Meisner

Attorney at Schagrin Associates

900 7Th Street, Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20001

Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David J. Craven

Attorney at Craven Trade Law LLC

3744 N Ashland

Chicago, IL 60613

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/12/2021. [757727] Entry of Appearance due 03/08/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/08/2021. Docketing Statement due 03/24/2021. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 04/23/2021. [MMA] [Entered: 02/22/2021 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bruskin International LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CAMBRIA COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MS INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant