This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/27/2022 at 06:15:39 (UTC).

M. S., et al v. Premera Blue Cross, et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 M S filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Premera Blue Cross. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-4056

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Defendants

MICROSOFT CORPORATION

MICROSOFT CORPORATION WELFARE PLAN

Plaintiff / Appellees

M. S.

L. S.

C. J. S.

Defendant / Appellant

PREMERA BLUE CROSS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Gwendolyn C. Payton

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton

1420 5Th Avenue, Suite 3700

Seattle, WA 98101

Timothy C. Houpt

Attorney at Parsons Behle & Latimer

201 South Main Street, Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Mark D. Tolman

Attorney at Parsons Behle & Latimer

201 South Main Street, Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Adam Howard Charnes

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400

Dallas, TX 75201

Geoffrey L. Chesnut

51 East 400 North, Building 1, P.O. Box 1808

Cedar City, UT 84721-1808

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Brian Smith King

Attorney at Brian S. King, Attorney at Law

420 East South Temple, Suite 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at Brian S. King, Attorney at Law

420 East South Temple, Suite 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

[10924254] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Adam Howard Charnes for Premera Blue Cross. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. [22-4056] [Entered: 07/05/2022 03:48 PM]

Open Document

[10924579] Entry of appearance filed by Gwendolyn C. Payton for Premera Blue Cross. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/06/2022. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [22-4056] [Entered: 07/06/2022 02:39 PM]

Open Document

[10925372] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Premera Blue Cross. Transcript ordered: 07/14/2021 - Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing and 05/17/2022 - Motion for Attorney Fees & Supplemental Proceedings. Served on: 07/08/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4056] GCP [Entered: 07/08/2022 02:26 PM]

Open Document

[10926250] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by C. J. S., L. S. and M. S. in 22-4056, 22-4061. Transcript ordered: Motion for Attorney Fees and Supplemental Proceedings held 5/17/22. Served on: 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4056, 22-4061] BSK [Entered: 07/12/2022 04:42 PM]

Open Document

[10926261] Docketing statement filed by Premera Blue Cross. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-4056] GCP [Entered: 07/12/2022 05:11 PM]

Open Document

[10926281] Entry of appearance filed by Brian Smith King for L. S., M. S. and C. J. S. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-4056, 22-4061] [Entered: 07/13/2022 06:55 AM]

Open Document

[10926289] Entry of appearance filed by Gwendolyn C. Payton for Premera Blue Cross and Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Corporation Welfare Plan. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/13/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4056] [Entered: 07/13/2022 07:35 AM]

Open Document

[10926473] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. ZoomGov conference scheduled for 07/27/2022 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. Please open the Notice for important information. [22-4056]--[Edited 07/14/2022 by DM] [Entered: 07/13/2022 12:21 PM]

Open Document

[10926938] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Timothy C. Houpt and Mr. Mark D. Tolman for not parties Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Corporation Welfare Plan. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/14/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-4056] [Entered: 07/14/2022 04:42 PM]

Open Document

[10927080] Order filed by Clerk of the Court consolidating appeals for preparation of appendix, briefing, oral argument (if granted), and submission. All appellants shall file a single, consolidated opening brief. Appellants shall also file a single, consolidated appendix. Appellees shall file a single, consolidated response brief and appellants shall file a single, consolidated reply brief. Please see attached order for additional information. Served on 07/15/2022. [22-4056, 22-4061] [Entered: 07/15/2022 11:57 AM]

Open Document

[10930917] Transcript order form letter sent. Transcript order form now due 08/09/2022 for R. Edward Young. [22-4056] [Entered: 08/02/2022 11:06 AM]

Open Document

[10931017] Transcript order form filed by Mr. R. Edward Young. Transcripts (7/14/22 motion for summary judgment hearing and 5/17/22 motion for attorneys fees hearing ) due 09/15/2022 for R. Edward Young. [22-4056] [Entered: 08/02/2022 02:13 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10931017] Transcript order form filed by Mr. R. Edward Young. Transcripts (7/14/22 motion for summary judgment hearing and 5/17/22 motion for attorneys fees hearing ) due 09/15/2022 for R. Edward Young. [22-4056] [Entered: 08/02/2022 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10930917] Transcript order form letter sent. Transcript order form now due 08/09/2022 for R. Edward Young. [22-4056] [Entered: 08/02/2022 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10927080] Order filed by Clerk of the Court consolidating appeals for preparation of appendix, briefing, oral argument (if granted), and submission. All appellants shall file a single, consolidated opening brief. Appellants shall also file a single, consolidated appendix. Appellees shall file a single, consolidated response brief and appellants shall file a single, consolidated reply brief. Please see attached order for additional information. Served on 07/15/2022. [22-4056, 22-4061] [Entered: 07/15/2022 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10926938] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Timothy C. Houpt and Mr. Mark D. Tolman for not parties Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Corporation Welfare Plan. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/14/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-4056] [Entered: 07/14/2022 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Docket[10926931] Entry of appearance submitted by Timothy C. Houpt and Mark D. Tolman for Not Parties Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Corporation Welfare Plan for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4056]--[Edited 07/14/2022 by JM PDF removed filed 7/14/22.] TCH [Entered: 07/14/2022 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10926473] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. ZoomGov conference scheduled for 07/27/2022 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. Please open the Notice for important information. [22-4056]--[Edited 07/14/2022 by DM] [Entered: 07/13/2022 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10926289] Entry of appearance filed by Gwendolyn C. Payton for Premera Blue Cross and Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Corporation Welfare Plan. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/13/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4056] [Entered: 07/13/2022 07:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10926281] Entry of appearance filed by Brian Smith King for L. S., M. S. and C. J. S. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-4056, 22-4061] [Entered: 07/13/2022 06:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10926261] Docketing statement filed by Premera Blue Cross. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-4056] GCP [Entered: 07/12/2022 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docket[10926257] Entry of appearance submitted by Gwendolyn C. Payton for Appellant Premera Blue Cross for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-4056]--[Edited 07/13/2022 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] GCP [Entered: 07/12/2022 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docket[10926256] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 07/26/2022 for R. Edward Young. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-4056] [Entered: 07/12/2022 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10926250] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by C. J. S., L. S. and M. S. in 22-4056, 22-4061. Transcript ordered: Motion for Attorney Fees and Supplemental Proceedings held 5/17/22. Served on: 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4056, 22-4061] BSK [Entered: 07/12/2022 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docket[10926248] Entry of appearance submitted by Brian S. King for Appellees C. J. S., L. S. and M. S. in 22-4056, 22-4061 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4056, 22-4061]--[Edited 07/13/2022 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 7/13/22] BSK [Entered: 07/12/2022 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Docket[10925379] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 07/22/2022 for R. Edward Young (07/14/2021 - Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing and 05/17/2022 - Motion for Attorney Fees & Supplemental Proceedings). (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-4056] [Entered: 07/08/2022 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10925372] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Premera Blue Cross. Transcript ordered: 07/14/2021 - Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing and 05/17/2022 - Motion for Attorney Fees & Supplemental Proceedings. Served on: 07/08/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4056] GCP [Entered: 07/08/2022 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10924579] Entry of appearance filed by Gwendolyn C. Payton for Premera Blue Cross. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/06/2022. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [22-4056] [Entered: 07/06/2022 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Docket[10924567] Entry of appearance submitted by Gwendolyn C. Payton for Appellant Premera Blue Cross in 22-4056 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/06/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-4056] --[Edited 07/06/2022 by SLS to remove docket entry from 22-4061 and to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] GCP [Entered: 07/06/2022 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10924254] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Adam Howard Charnes for Premera Blue Cross. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. [22-4056] [Entered: 07/05/2022 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket[10924233] Entry of appearance submitted by Adam H. Charnes for Appellant Premera Blue Cross in 22-4056 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/05/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4056]--[Edited 07/05/2022 by KLP to delete from 22-4061 and to delete the attachment; entry filed.] AHC [Entered: 07/05/2022 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10922886] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/28/2022 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 07/12/2022 for Premera Blue Cross. Notice of appearance also due on 07/12/2022 for C. J. S., L. S. and M. S. [22-4056] [Entered: 06/28/2022 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Microsoft Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy C. Houpt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gwendolyn C. Payton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Tolman