This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2020 at 06:06:06 (UTC).

M. M. v. County of San Mateo, et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 M M filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of San Mateo. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15209

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

GARY BROWN

Defendant / Appellees

DEVIN CROCKER

JAMES BROWN

ROBERT WILLETT

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

Plaintiff / Appellant

M. M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel Todd McCloskey Esquire

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1900 University Avenue

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Tara E. Heumann

Attorney at San Mateo County Counsel's Office

400 County Center, 6Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94063-1662

Daniel T. McCloskey

Attorney at San Mateo County Counsel's Office

400 County Center, 6Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94063-1662

Jan E. Ellard

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE COUNTY COUNSEL

400 County Center

Redwood City, CA 94063

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joseph Samuel May Esquire

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph S. May

1388 Sutter Street, Suite 810

San Francisco, CA 94109

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 04/14/2020, 09:30 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11643181] (BLS) [Entered: 03/26/2020 04:10 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 03/26/2020, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11609483] (BLS) [Entered: 02/26/2020 10:59 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant M. M. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/18/2020. [11600959] [20-15209] (May, Joseph) [Entered: 02/18/2020 06:36 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney Jan E. Ellard for Appellees County of San Mateo, et al., in case 20-15209. [11643186] (HH) [Entered: 03/26/2020 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 04/14/2020, 09:30 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11643181] (BLS) [Entered: 03/26/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jan E. Ellard (San Mateo County Counsel's Office, 400 County of San Mateo, 6th Floor, Redwood City, CA 94063) for Appellee County of San Mateo. Date of service: 03/26/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11643177] [20-15209] (Ellard, Jan) [Entered: 03/26/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tara E. Heumann (San Mateo County Counsel 400 County Center, 6th Floor, Redwood City, CA 94063) for Appellees James Brown, County of San Mateo, Devin Crocker and Robert Willett. Substitution for Attorney Tara E. Heumann for Appellees James Brown, County of San Mateo, Devin Crocker and Robert Willett. Date of service: 03/26/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11642758] [20-15209] (Heumann, Tara) [Entered: 03/26/2020 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel T. McCloskey (San Mateo County Counsel 400 County Center 6th Floor, Redwood City, CA 94063) for Appellees James Brown, County of San Mateo, Devin Crocker and Robert Willett. Substitution for Attorney Daniel T. McCloskey for Appellees James Brown, County of San Mateo, Devin Crocker and Robert Willett. Date of service: 03/26/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11642752] [20-15209] (McCloskey, Daniel) [Entered: 03/26/2020 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 03/26/2020, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11609483] (BLS) [Entered: 02/26/2020 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/18/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11600968]. [20-15209] (AD) [Entered: 02/18/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant M. M. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/18/2020. [11600959] [20-15209] (May, Joseph) [Entered: 02/18/2020 06:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant M. M. Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/19/2020. Transcript ordered by 03/11/2020. Transcript due 04/10/2020. Appellant M. M. opening brief due 05/20/2020. Appellees James Brown, County of San Mateo, Devin Crocker and Robert Willett answering brief due 06/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11595008] (RT) [Entered: 02/12/2020 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.