Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 06:29:31 (UTC).

Lynn Oxenberg, et al v. Secretary United States Depart

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Lynn Oxenberg filed an Other lawsuit against Secretary United States Depart. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1682

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

LYNN OXENBERG

RONALD LEWIS

Defendant / Appellee

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James C. Pistorino Esq.

Attorney at Parrish Law Offices

788 Washington Road

Pittsburgh, PA 15228

Brittany C. Armour Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

1717 Arch Street, Three Logan Square, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Nicholas R. Rodriguez Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

1717 Arch Street, Three Logan Square, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

David B. Goroff Esq.

Attorney at Foley & Lardner

321 North Clark Street, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Veronica J. Finkelstein Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Matthew Howatt Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Eric Wolfish Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Eric S. Wolfish Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Health and Human Services

801 Market Street, Suite 9700

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Ronald Lewis and Lynn Oxenberg for Extension of Time to file To file their Initial Brief and Appendix until/for 30 days or June 8, 2021. Certificate of Service dated 05/24/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 05/24/2021 05:00 PM]

11 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

11 #1

Standing Order

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Ronald Lewis and Lynn Oxenberg advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:02 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Lynn Oxenberg. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:51 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Ronald Lewis. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:50 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Ronald Lewis and Lynn Oxenberg. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:49 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Ronald Lewis and Lynn Oxenberg. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:48 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David B. Goroff on behalf of Appellant(s) Lynn Oxenberg, Ronald Lewis. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:24 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Eric S. Wolfish on behalf of Appellee(s) Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services. [21-1682] (ESW) [Entered: 04/20/2021 11:36 AM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew E. K. Howatt on behalf of Appellee(s) Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services. [21-1682] (MH) [Entered: 04/13/2021 11:48 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Memorandum Opinion

#1

Notice of Appeal

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting motion for extension of time filed by Appellants Lynn Oxenberg and Ronald Lewis. Appellants' brief and appendix must be filed and served on or before July 8, 2021. (MB) [Entered: 05/27/2021 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Ronald Lewis and Lynn Oxenberg for Extension of Time to file To file their Initial Brief and Appendix until/for 30 days or June 8, 2021. Certificate of Service dated 05/24/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 05/24/2021 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Ronald Lewis and Lynn Oxenberg due on or before 06/08/2021. Appendix due on or before 06/08/2021. (PDB) [Entered: 04/29/2021 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Ronald Lewis and Lynn Oxenberg advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Lynn Oxenberg. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Ronald Lewis. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Ronald Lewis and Lynn Oxenberg. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Ronald Lewis and Lynn Oxenberg. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David B. Goroff on behalf of Appellant(s) Lynn Oxenberg, Ronald Lewis. [21-1682] (DBG) [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Eric S. Wolfish on behalf of Appellee(s) Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services. [21-1682] (ESW) [Entered: 04/20/2021 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew E. K. Howatt on behalf of Appellee(s) Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services. [21-1682] (MH) [Entered: 04/13/2021 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 04/13/2021 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Ronald Lewis and Lynn Oxenberg in District Court No. 2-20-cv-00738. (AMR) [Entered: 04/13/2021 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VERONICA JANE FINKELSTEIN