This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/31/2023 at 05:18:04 (UTC).

Lynk Labs, Inc. v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2023 Lynk Labs, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-1671

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

LYNK LABS, INC.

Appellee

HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Stephen McBride

Appellee Attorney

Brian K. Erickson

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

03/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/22/2023. [912950] Entry of Appearance is due on 04/12/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/12/2023. Docketing Statement is due 04/12/2023. Certified List is due on 05/08/2023. [CMH] [Entered: 03/29/2023 11:47 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less