This case was last updated from PACER on 08/05/2019 at 07:07:00 (UTC).

Lyndsay Davidson, et al v. County of Los Angeles, et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 Lyndsay Davidson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Los Angeles. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55645

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

LYNDSAY DAVIDSON, an Individual

W.S., Minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Lyndsay Davidson

TYLER SPRADLING, an Individual

P.S., Minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Lyndsay Davidson

R.S., Minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Lyndsay Davidson

BRANDON SALINAS, an Individual

M.S., Minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Lyndsay Davidson

Defendant / Appellees

PRINCESS MOTON, an Individual

SHEILA LOTA, an Individual

GEORGINA ACOSTA, an Individual

VICTORIA CISNEROS, an Individual

CYNTHIA WONG, an Individual

FNU PEREZ, an Individual

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, by and through The Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services

LILY RODRIGUEZ, an Individual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Vincent Walter Davis Esquire

Attorney at Law Offices of Vincent W. Davis & Associates

150 North Santa Anita Avenue, Suite 200

Arcadia, CA 91006

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Clayton C. Averbuck Esquire

Attorney at MONROY, AVERBUCK AND GYSLER

32123 Lindero Canyon Road

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Jennifer Gysler

Attorney at MONROY, AVERBUCK AND GYSLER

32123 Lindero Canyon Road

Westlake Village, CA 91361

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Lyndsay Davidson, M.S., P.S., R.S., Brandon Salinas, Tyler Spradling and W.S. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/13/2019. [11330294] [19-55645] (Davis, Vincent) [Entered: 06/13/2019 02:12 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11382783] (BS) [Entered: 07/31/2019 12:52 PM]

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellants only, 07/30/2019, 11:00 a.m., Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. See order for details. [11378668] (BS) [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:56 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 07/25/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11342729] (BS) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:53 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 07/30/2019, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled for 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time). [11379529] (BS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 12:32 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11382783] (BS) [Entered: 07/31/2019 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 07/30/2019, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled for 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time). [11379529] (BS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellants only, 07/30/2019, 11:00 a.m., Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. See order for details. [11378668] (BS) [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#5) Terminated Clayton C. Averbuck for Cynthia Wong, Lily Rodriguez, Princess Moton, Sheila Lota, County of Los Angeles, Victoria Cisneros and Georgina Acosta in 19-55645 - DECEASED per CA bar. [11361713] (SLM) [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 07/25/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11342729] (BS) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/13/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11331010][19-55645] (AD) [Entered: 06/13/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Lyndsay Davidson, M.S., P.S., R.S., Brandon Salinas, Tyler Spradling and W.S. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/13/2019. [11330294] [19-55645] (Davis, Vincent) [Entered: 06/13/2019 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/13/2019. Transcript ordered by 07/05/2019. Transcript due 08/05/2019. Appellants Lyndsay Davidson, M.S., P.S., R.S., Brandon Salinas, Tyler Spradling and W.S. opening brief due 09/13/2019. Appellees Georgina Acosta, Victoria Cisneros, County of Los Angeles, Sheila Lota, Princess Moton, FNU Perez, Lily Rodriguez and Cynthia Wong answering brief due 10/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11321609] (JBS) [Entered: 06/06/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.