This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/26/2019 at 06:07:35 (UTC).

Lydia Tummel, et al v. Robert Milane, et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 Lydia Tummel, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Robert Milane,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-40148

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

LYDIA TUMMEL

HAROLD K. TUMMEL

Defendant / Appellees

ROBERT MILANE

ROADRUNNER TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, INCORPORATED

ROADRUNNER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Harold Kenneth Tummel

Peter Thomas Martin

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mary-Olga Lovett

Hiba Kazim

Angeles Garcia Cassin

Nicole Leonard

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Appellant/Petitioner Brief Filed

Open Document #2

Brief Paper Copies Form

Open Document #1

Record Excerpts Filed

Open Document #2

RE-5 Electronic Filers Letter

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellants Mr. Harold K. Tummel and Ms. Lydia Tummel [ # 9026857-2 ] Date of service: 04/23/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cassin, Kazim, Leonard, Lovett; Attorney for Appellant: Tummel; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Martin [19-40148] (Harold Kenneth Tummel ) [Entered: 04/23/2019 12:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketPaper copies of Appellant Brief filed by Appellants Ms. Lydia Tummel and Mr. Harold K. Tummel in 19-40148 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-40148] (SBS) [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Lydia Tummel. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require Table of Content to have numerical tabs and the ROA numbers listed. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 04/25/2019 for Appellants Harold K. Tummel and Lydia Tummel [19-40148] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Harold K. Tummel. Date of service: 04/10/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cassin, Kazim, Leonard, Lovett; Attorney for Appellant: Tummel; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Martin [19-40148] (Harold Kenneth Tummel ) [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Lydia Tummel. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 05/10/2019 for Appellees Robert Milane, Roadrunner Transportation Services, Incorporated and Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Incorporated. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/16/2019 for Appellants Harold K. Tummel and Lydia Tummel. [19-40148] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Harold K. Tummel. Date of service: 04/10/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cassin, Kazim, Leonard, Lovett; Attorney for Appellant: Tummel; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Martin [19-40148] (Harold Kenneth Tummel ) [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Angeles Garcia Cassin for party(s) Appellee Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Incorporated Appellee Robert Milane Appellee Roadrunner Transportation Services, Incorporated, in case 19-40148 [19-40148] (DMS) [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40148] (Angeles Garcia Cassin ) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Hiba Kazim for Appellee Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Incorporated in 19-40148, Attorney Hiba Kazim for Appellee Roadrunner Transportation Services, Incorporated in 19-40148, Attorney Hiba Kazim for Appellee Robert Milane in 19-40148 [19-40148] (DMS) [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Nicole Leonard for party(s) Appellee Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Incorporated Appellee Robert Milane Appellee Roadrunner Transportation Services, Incorporated, in case 19-40148 [19-40148] (DMS) [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mary-Olga Lovett for Appellee Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Incorporated in 19-40148, Attorney Mary-Olga Lovett for Appellee Roadrunner Transportation Services, Incorporated in 19-40148, Attorney Mary-Olga Lovett for Appellee Robert Milane in 19-40148 [19-40148] (DMS) [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mrs. Hiba Kazim for Mr. Robert Milane, Roadrunner Transportation Services, Incorporated and Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40148] (Hiba Kazim ) [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40148] (Nicole Leonard ) [Entered: 03/18/2019 10:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Mary-Olga Lovett for Mr. Robert Milane, Roadrunner Transportation Services, Incorporated and Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40148] (Mary-Olga Lovett ) [Entered: 03/18/2019 10:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Harold Kenneth Tummel for Appellant Lydia Tummel in 19-40148 [19-40148] (AGL) [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Harold Kenneth Tummel for Mr. Harold K. Tummel and Ms. Lydia Tummel for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40148] (Harold Kenneth Tummel ) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/22/2019 for Appellants Harold K. Tummel and Lydia Tummel. [19-40148] (DDL) [Entered: 03/11/2019 01:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-40148] (DDL) [Entered: 03/11/2019 01:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 7:18-CV-339. Electronic ROA due on 03/19/2019. [19-40148] (DMS) [Entered: 03/04/2019 08:37 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8996657-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-40148] (DMS) [Entered: 03/04/2019 08:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Harold K. Tummel and Ms. Lydia Tummel [19-40148] (AS) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:33 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less